Knight v. Cooper, et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Orlando L Garcia |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00234 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:06 AM CDT |
Defendant
Central Hauling Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cameron Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Neutral
Scott M. Bage
Scott M. Bage, P.C. 3510 N. St. Mary's Suite 100
San Antonio, TX 78212 |
Represented By
|
Neutral
Joseph Casseb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronit Knight
|
Represented By
|
Responsible 3rd Party
VIA Metropolitan Transit
123 N. Medina St.
San Antonio, TX 78207 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
88 | 88
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/07 10:19 AM
ORDER GRANTING87 Motion for Entry of Order on Bill of Costs. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
87 | 87
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/28 11:46 AM
Opposed MOTION for Entry of Order on Bill of Costs by Central Hauling Company, Inc., Cameron Cooper.(Rhodes, Christopher) Modified on 2/28/2019 (rg) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |