SATYAM, INC v. Poolin et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ezra |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00236 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:00 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mizzy Resorts LLC
42 Esmond Avenue
Melville, NY 11747 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael A Poolin
1115 1st Ave
New York, NY 10065 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SATYAM, INC
6502 W old US Highway 90
San Antonio, TX 78227 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 05/22 3:21 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re8 MOTION to Dismiss by Agreed Stipulation filed by Mizzy Resorts LLC, Michael A Poolin,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Wed 05/17 1:26 PM
Proposed Order to Dismiss Attached filed by Mizzy Resorts LLC, Michael A Poolin. (Minter, Darrell) Modified Text & Termed Mtn. on 5/17/2017 (wg) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Wed 05/17 1:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Agreed Stipulation by Mizzy Resorts LLC, Michael A Poolin. (Minter, Darrell) |
|
utility
Notice of Correction
Wed 05/17 4:03 PM
Notice of Correction: Proposed Order filed as a Motion, Termed Mtn. and Edited Text re9 MOTION to Dismiss Order . (wg) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/08 3:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 7/6/2017, Amended Pleadings due by 8/7/2017, Discovery due by 10/10/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 8/7/2017, Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2017, The Court will set the case for trial by separate order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 04/26 5:02 PM
Scheduling Recommendations by Mizzy Resorts LLC, Michael A Poolin. (Minter, Darrell) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/07 4:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Mizzy Resorts LLC, Michael A Poolin.(Minter, Darrell) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial
Tue 03/28 9:04 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Parties shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Remark
Fri 03/24 9:32 AM
Letter to Attorney NICK BHAKTA regarding Admission to Practice in the Western District of Texas. (mgr) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Supplement
Thu 03/23 4:03 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal, by Mizzy Resorts LLC, Michael A Poolin. (Minter, Darrell) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/22 6:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mizzy Resorts LLC, Michael A Poolin (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9419639), filed by Mizzy Resorts LLC, Michael A Poolin.(Minter, Darrell) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Copy of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Original Petition filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/24 9:08 AM
Case Assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Fri 03/24 9:09 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo (mgr) |