Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C. v. JT Group, Inc. et al
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00228 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 Restrictions on Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
JT Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
James Turner
|
|
Plaintiff
Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) - public docket entry
Thu 07/20 1:20 PM
Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (kwf) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 07/19 10:03 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C. (Kolbus, Heather) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 05/26 8:43 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Good cause having been shown, plaintiff's motion to extend its deadline to serve the defendants pursuant to Rule 4(m)15 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/26/2017. (kwf) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/25 1:18 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C.. Response due 6/1/2017. (Kolbus, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Georgia Secretary of State Address, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Westlaw Address, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Waiver of Service Sent 4.26.17, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Proof of Delivery of Waiver of Service Sent 4.26.17, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E: Waiver of Service and Documents Sent to JT Group, Inc. 5.4.17, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F: Proof of Delivery of Waivers and Documents Sent 5.4.17, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G: Waiver of Service and Documents Sent to James Turner 5.4.17 | ||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Mon 05/22 1:52 PM
Amended Document by Plaintiff Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C.. Amendment to12 Summons Returned Unexecuted Amended Return of Service (Kolbus, Heather) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Mon 05/22 1:48 PM
Amended Document by Plaintiff Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C.. Amendment to11 Summons Returned Unexecuted Amended Return of Service (Kolbus, Heather) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Thu 05/04 2:08 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Defendant James Turner as to James Turner. (Kolbus, Heather) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Thu 05/04 2:06 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Defendant JT Group, Inc. as to JT Group, Inc. (Kolbus, Heather) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/27 4:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C.. (Kolbus, Heather) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Text Only Order
Thu 03/23 10:07 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Briefing on plaintiffs' motion to certify a Rule 23 class4 is stayed pending entry of a full schedule at the not-yet scheduled telephonic preliminary pretrial conferenc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/23/2017. (kwf) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to JT Group, Inc., (kwf) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to James Turner | ||
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Thu 03/23 9:37 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Thu 03/23 9:38 AM
Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] ,[LINK:Order Regarding Assignment of Cases] ,[LINK:Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment] ,[LINK:Order on Dispositive Motions] . (kwf) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Continue
Wed 03/22 11:38 AM
Motion to Continue and Enter Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Plaintiff Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C.. Response due 3/29/2017. (Edelman, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
respm
Brief in Support
Wed 03/22 11:32 AM
Brief in Support of4 Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23,, by Plaintiff Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C. (Edelman, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Fax Received 6/20/2015, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Fax Received 9/13/2015, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Fax Received 11/12/2015, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Fax Received 2015, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E: Fax Received 7/01/2016, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F: Fax Received 10/17/2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Declaration (not related to a motion)
Wed 03/22 11:22 AM
Declaration of Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Certify Class under Rule 23
Wed 03/22 11:13 AM
Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23 by Plaintiff Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C.. Brief in Opposition due 4/12/2017. Brief in Reply due 4/24/2017. (Edelman, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit G: Supreme Court Holds that an Unaccepted Offer of Judgment Doesn't Moot a Class Action, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit H: Supreme Court Rules Settlement Offer Does Not Moot Class Action, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit I: U.S. Supreme Court Limits Ability of Class Action Defendants to "Pick Off" Named Plaintiffs | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/22 11:00 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Heather Autumn Kolbus for Plaintiff Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C.. (Kolbus, Heather) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/22 10:57 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel A. Edelman for Plaintiff Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C.. (Edelman, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 10:54 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-1993839.), filed by Spennetta Family Care Chiropractic, S.C.. (Edelman, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Fax Received 6/20/2015, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Fax Received 9/13/2015, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Fax Received 11/12/2015, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Fax Received 2015, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E: Fax Received 7/01/2015, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F: Fax Received 10/17/2016, | ||
Att: 7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Summons JT Group, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 Summons James Turner |