C., J. v. Ashland County, Wisconsin et al
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | James D Peterson |
Referred: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00229 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 3:51 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ashland County, Wisconsin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael E. Brennan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony Jones
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. L. B. C.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) - public docket entry
Thu 04/05 10:15 AM
Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (kwf) |
||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/04 1:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (Baudhuin, Danielle) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/04 1:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (Baudhuin, Danielle) |
|
38 | 38
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/04 1:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00404-jdp, 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp (Baudhuin, Danielle) |
|
37 | 37
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/04 1:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (Baudhuin, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 03/14 11:36 AM
ORDER denying (42) motion to dismiss with prejudice; dismissing this case without prejudice for plaintiff B.L.W.'s failure to prosecute it. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/14/2018. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (jls) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Declaration
Mon 03/05 5:37 PM
Declaration of H. Craig Haukaas filed by Plaintiffs T. R. J., M. J. P., J. L. B. C., B. L. W., M. J. P. re: (42 in 3:17-cv-00023-jdp) Motion to Dismiss Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (Olson, Jeff) |
|
Att: 1 Letter to Judge Peterson | ||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Affidavit
Fri 02/09 9:40 AM
Affidavit of Mailing filed by Plaintiff B. L. W. re: (27 in 3:17-cv-00404-jdp) Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp. (Haukaas, H.) Modified on 2/9/2018. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 02/07 10:11 AM
Certificate of Service by Defendants Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of Ashland County Jail as to (42 in 3:17-cv-00023-jdp) MOTION TO DISMISS, (44 in 3:17-cv-00023-jdp) Affidavit, (43 in 3:17-cv-00023-jdp) Brief in Support. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (Baudhuin, Danielle) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 02/06 2:49 PM
ORDER granting 38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney H. Craig Haukaas and Jeff Scott Olson terminated in case 3:17-cv-00023-jdp. Counsel is directed to serve a copy of this order upon B.L.W. at her last known address. B.L.W. must respond to this order indicating her intent to continue to litigate this case by February 27, 2018. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/6/2018. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (jls) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Fri 01/26 3:31 PM
Text of Proposed Order by Plaintiff B. L. W. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp. (Haukaas, H.) Modified on 1/26/2018. (lak) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Affidavit
Fri 01/26 2:56 PM
Affidavit of Craig Haukaas filed by Plaintiff B. L. W. re: (24 in 3:17-cv-00404-jdp) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (Haukaas, H.) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 01/26 2:55 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff B. L. W., Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp. (Haukaas, H.) Modified on 1/26/2018. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter to Judge Peterson | ||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 12/18 1:55 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Although the court is not particularly sympathetic to plaintiffs' motion to extend their expert disclosure deadline, it will grant the requested extension over defendants' objection with a warning to plaintiffs and their attorney: you must attend more diligently to your clear discovery and scheduling obligations in this case because the court is not inclined to cut you any more slack. Depending on the nature of any future disputes, the court will impose Rule 37(b) sanctions if necessary. That said, the court will not look for trouble. Plaintiffs' expert disclosure deadline is extended to January 12, 2018. Defendants' deadline to disclose experts is extended to February 23, 2018. Defendants' deadline to file dispositive motions is extended to March 9, 2018 (while plaintiffs' deadline remains on February 16, 2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/18/2017. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (jls) |
|
Saturday, December 16, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Sat 12/16 2:57 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Plaintiffs T. R. J., M. J. P., J. L. B. C., B. L. W., M. J. P. re (25 in 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 34 in 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 23 in 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 24 in 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 20 in 3:17-cv-00404-jdp) Motion to Quash Subpoena, Motion to Stay Deposition Proceedings, Motion for Protective Order and For Costs filed by Traci Rongstad, Mary Pliss . Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (Olson, Jeff) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Declaration
Wed 12/13 2:00 PM
Declaration of Monica Burkert-Brist filed by Movants Mary Pliss, Traci Rongstad re: (20 in 3:17-cv-00404-jdp) Motion to Quash,, Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (Burkert-Brist, Monica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Email dated Dec. 11, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Quash
Wed 12/13 1:57 PM
Motion to Quash Subpoena, Motion to Stay Deposition Proceedings, Motion for Protective Order and For Costs by Movants Mary Pliss, Mary Pliss, Mary Pliss, Mary Pliss, Mary Pliss, Traci Rongstad, Traci Rongstad, Traci Rongstad, Traci Rongstad, Traci Rongstad. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 12/20/2017. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (Burkert-Brist, Monica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Subpoena for Mary Pliss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Subpoena for Traci Rongstad | ||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Affidavit
Fri 12/01 11:58 AM
Affidavit of Danielle E. Baudhuin filed by Defendants Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of Ashland County Jail, Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of Ashland County Jail, Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail, Ashland County, Wisconsin, Mick Brennan, Tony Jones, Other Employees of Ashland County Jail, Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of Ashland County Jail re: (18 in 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 17 in 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 13 in 3:17-cv-00404-jdp, 27 in 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 16 in 3:17-cv-00314-jdp) MOTION for Extension of Time, Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00404-jdp, 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp (Baudhuin, Danielle) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Brief in Opposition
Fri 12/01 11:55 AM
Brief in Opposition by Defendants Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of Ashland County Jail, Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of Ashland County Jail, Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail, Ashland County, Wisconsin, Mick Brennan, Tony Jones, Other Employees of Ashland County Jail, Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of Ashland County Jail re: (13 in 3:17-cv-00404-jdp, 27 in 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 18 in 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 17 in 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 16 in 3:17-cv-00314-jdp) MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by B. L. W., T. R. J., M. J. P., J. L. B. C. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00404-jdp, 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp (Baudhuin, Danielle) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/30 12:09 PM
Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel filed by Jeff Scott Olson for Plaintiffs T. R. J., M. J. P., J. L. B. C., B. L. W., M. J. P.. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (Olson, Jeff) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Mon 11/27 4:05 PM
Text of Proposed Order by Plaintiffs T. R. J., M. J. P., J. L. B. C., B. L. W., M. J. P. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp. (Haukaas, H.) Modified on 11/27/2017. (lak) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Affidavit
Mon 11/27 4:04 PM
Affidavit of Craig Haukaas filed by Plaintiffs T. R. J., M. J. P., J. L. B. C., B. L. W., M. J. P. re: (18 in 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 17 in 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 13 in 3:17-cv-00404-jdp, 27 in 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 16 in 3:17-cv-00314-jdp) MOTION for Extension of Time, Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp (Haukaas, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Circulum Vitae and List of Testimony of Expert Witness | ||
19 | 19
respm
Affidavit
Mon 11/27 3:07 PM
Disregard. To be refiled with exhibit/attachment separated and described. Affidavit of Craig Haukaas filed by Plaintiffs T. R. J., M. J. P., J. L. B. C., B. L. W., M. J. P. re: (18 in 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 17 in 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 13 in 3:17-cv-00404-jdp, 27 in 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 16 in 3:17-cv-00314-jdp) MOTION for Extension of Time. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp. (Haukaas, H.) Modified on 11/27/2017: Case number. (lak) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 11/27 3:04 PM
Motion for Extension of Time for Disclosure of Plaintiff's Expert Witness Reports by Plaintiffs T. R. J., M. J. P., J. L. B. C., B. L. W., M. J. P. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 12/4/2017. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp, 3:17-cv-00404-jdp. (Haukaas, H.) Modified on 11/27/2017: Case number. (lak) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/27 3:28 PM
Set Deadlines as to (13 in 3:17-cv-00404-jdp, 27 in 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 18 in 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 17 in 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 16 in 3:17-cv-00314-jdp) Motion for Extension of Time For disclosure of Plaintiff's Expert Witness Reports . Response due 12/4/2017. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00404-jdp, 3:17-cv-00023-jdp, 3:17-cv-00229-jdp, 3:17-cv-00242-jdp, 3:17-cv-00314-jdp (jls) |
||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Tue 10/31 9:53 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Parties will file all future submissions in Case No. 17-cv-23. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/31/2017. (jls) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Fri 10/27 3:45 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order on Motion to Consolidate Actions by Plaintiff J. L. B. C. (Haukaas, H.) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Affidavit
Mon 08/28 4:23 PM
Affidavit of Lori M. Lubinsky filed by Defendants Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail re:13 Motion to Consolidate Cases (Lubinsky, Lori) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plf BLW's Responses, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plf JLBC's Responses, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plf TRJ's Responses, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Plf MJP's Responses, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Plf MJP f/k/a MJS's Responses | ||
14 | 14
respm
Brief in Opposition
Mon 08/28 4:18 PM
Brief in Opposition by Defendants Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail re:13 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by J. L. B. C. (Lubinsky, Lori) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Consolidate Cases
Mon 08/21 1:29 PM
Motion to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff J. L. B. C. Response due 8/28/2017. (Haukaas, H.) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference
Thu 07/20 12:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/29/2017 [:15] (cak) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference
Fri 06/30 3:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/27/2017. [:20] (kwf) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Pretrial Conference Order
Wed 06/28 11:50 AM
Pretrial Conference Order - Dispositive Motions due 2/16/2018. Settlement Letters due 6/8/2018. Motions in Limine due 6/15/2018. Response to Motion due 6/29/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2018 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/30/2018 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/27/2017. (jls) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/13 8:19 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ashland County, Wisconsin. (Baudhuin, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/31 2:14 PM
Amended Answer to1 Complaint, by Defendants Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail. (Baudhuin, Danielle) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report
Wed 05/31 9:12 AM
Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff J. L. B. C. (Haukaas, H.) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Pretrial or Status Conference
Wed 05/24 9:15 AM
Reset Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference reset at the request of plaintiff for 6/27/2017 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (jls) |
||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/23 10:36 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Lori Marie Lubinsky for Defendants Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail. (Lubinsky, Lori) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/22 10:19 AM
ANSWER by Defendants Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail. (Baudhuin, Danielle) |
|
utility
Set Pretrial or Status Conference
Mon 05/22 3:26 PM
Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (voc) |
||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 03/30 8:53 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail. Ashland County, Wisconsin waiver sent on 3/22/2017, answer due 5/23/2017; Michael E. Brennan waiver sent on 3/22/2017, answer due 5/23/2017; Anthony Jones waiver sent on 3/22/2017, answer due 5/23/2017; Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail waiver sent on 3/22/2017, answer due 5/23/2017. (Haukaas, H.) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 03/29 4:26 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants Ashland County, Wisconsin, Michael E. Brennan, Anthony Jones, Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail. Ashland County, Wisconsin waiver sent on 3/24/2017, answer due 5/23/2017; Michael E. Brennan waiver sent on 3/24/2017, answer due 5/23/2017; Anthony Jones waiver sent on 3/24/2017, answer due 5/23/2017; Other Employees of the Ashland County Jail waiver sent on 3/24/2017, answer due 5/23/2017. (Haukaas, H.) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/28 2:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff J. L. B. C. (Haukaas, H.) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/24 2:43 PM
Disregard. Two separate documents were filed. One document is not to be e-filed. Counsel notified. Modified on 3/24/2017. (lak) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 12:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Ashland County, Wisconsin, (kwf) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to Michael E. Brennan, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to Anthony Jones | ||
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Thu 03/23 11:18 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Thu 03/23 11:19 AM
Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (kwf) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT against J. L. B. C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-1994122.), filed by J. L. B. C., (Haukaas, H.) Modified on 3/22/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons - Ashland County, | ||
Att: 3 Summons - Michael E. Brennan, | ||
Att: 4 Summons - Anthony Jones |