Guenther, Dean v. Williams, Louis
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara B Crabb |
Referred: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00231 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jun 02, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2021 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
order
Text Only Order
Wed 06/02 2:23 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court's November 2, 2017 judgment is VACATED, petitioner Dean Guenther's petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 is GRANTED, and this case is transferred to the District of Minnesota for resentencing. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/2/2021. (kmd),(ps) |
|
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Judgment
Wed 06/02 1:41 PM
JUDGMENT from USCA reversing as to18 Notice of Appeal filed by Dean Guenther. No record to be returned. (kmd),(ps) |
|
Att: 1 Mandate, | ||
Att: 2 Appellate Opinion, | ||
Att: 3 Forthwith Order | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Wed 06/02 2:32 PM
Case transferred to[LINK:District of Minnesota] . Query case 21-cv-TBD. (kmd),(ps) |
||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 02/28 6:55 PM
ORDER from USCA that the District Court add attorney Shelley M. Fite to their CM/ECF database for purposes of accessing District Court documents as to18 Notice of Appeal filed by Dean Guenther (jef),(ps) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 12/07 12:11 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/7/2017. (nln),(ps) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet
Thu 11/30 3:53 PM
Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet re18 Notice of Appeal. (jef),(ps) |
|
23 | 23
appeal
Transcript Request Form
Thu 11/30 12:34 PM
Transcript Request Form by Petitioner Dean Guenther re18 Notice of Appeal. (nln),(ps) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Thu 11/30 12:29 PM
Inmate Account Statement by Petitioner Dean Guenther. (nln),(ps) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal
Thu 11/30 12:28 PM
Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on Appeal by Petitioner Dean Guenther. (nln),(ps) (Attachment(s) added on 11/30/2017: #1 Envelope) (nln) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 11/27 1:24 PM
USCA Case Number 17-3409 for18 Notice of Appeal filed by Dean Guenther. (jef),(ps) |
||
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
Transmission of Short Record to Seventh Circuit
Wed 11/22 1:51 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re18 Notice of Appeal. (jef),(ps) |
|
Att: 1 Docketing Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Order, | ||
Att: 3 Judgment, | ||
Att: 4 Docket sheet | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Appeal Information Packet
Wed 11/22 1:47 PM
Appeal Information Packet. (jef),(ps) |
|
18 | 18
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 11/22 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Petitioner Dean Guenther as to17 Judgment,16 Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Fee or motion for ifp due. Docketing Statement filed. (jef),(ps) |
|
Att: 1 Docketing Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Thu 11/02 3:36 PM
JUDGMENT entered denying the petition of Dean Guenther for a petition for a writ of certiorari under 28 U.S.C.§ 2241. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 11/2/2017. (jef),(ps) |
|
16 | 16
7
pgs
order
Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 11/02 3:28 PM
ORDER denying1 petition for a writ of certiorari under 28 U.S.C. §2241. Petitioner is GRANTED a certificate of appealability. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/2/2017. (jef),(ps) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Fri 09/01 11:37 AM
Letter from from petitioner requesting verification of receipt of signed reply brief. Docket sheet mailed to petitioner in response to this request. (elc),(ps) |
|
Att: 1 Copy of dkt. | ||
Att: 12 , | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Supplement
Thu 08/17 11:42 AM
Signed12 Brief in Reply filed by Dean Guenther (elc),(ps) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Wed 08/09 2:42 PM
Letter from clerk's office returning12 Brief in Reply to petitioner for signature. (elc),(ps) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Brief in Reply
Wed 08/09 2:16 PM
Brief in Reply (unsigned) by Petitioner Dean Guenther in Support of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (elc),(ps) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Exhibit
Tue 07/25 3:01 PM
Exhibit to9 Exhibit filed by Louis Williams, II 1992 First Degree Burglary Conviction (Herje, Leslie),(ps) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Exhibit
Tue 07/25 2:58 PM
Exhibit to7 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Louis Williams, II 1990 First Degree Burglary and Kidnapping Conviction (Herje, Leslie),(ps) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Exhibit
Tue 07/25 2:51 PM
Exhibit to7 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Louis Williams, II 1986 Second Degree Burglary Conviction (Herje, Leslie),(ps) |
|
utility
Set Briefing Deadlines
Tue 07/25 3:12 PM
Reset Briefing Deadlines as to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal. Petitioner's Brief in Reply due 8/24/2017. (nln),(ps) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Exhibit
Mon 07/24 5:11 PM
Exhibit to7 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Louis Williams, II ( Sealed Document ) (Herje, Leslie),(ps) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Response to Habeas Petition
Mon 07/24 5:09 PM
Response to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal by Respondent Louis Williams, II. (Herje, Leslie),(ps) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- 1986 Second Degree Burglary Conviction, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 1990 First Degree Burglary and Kidnapping Conviction, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - 1992 First Degree Burglary Conviction, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Sentencing Transcript, 04-cr-476, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certified Mail Return Receipt
Fri 06/02 10:06 AM
Certified Mail Receipt of3 Order to Show Cause, sent to J. Sessions, Attorney General of the United States. (elc),(ps) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certified Mail Return Receipt
Thu 06/01 9:52 AM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of3 Order to Show Cause, sent to the Acting United States Attorney for the Western District of Wisconsin. (elc),(ps) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certified Mail Return Receipt
Wed 05/31 2:24 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal,3 Order to Show Cause, sent to Warden Louis Williams. (jef),(ps) |
|
Att: 1 U.S. attorney MN | ||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 05/22 3:49 PM
Order to Show Cause Issued. Materials delivered to Respondent via certified mail. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/22/2017. (jef),(ps) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 03/28 10:48 AM
Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 34690028574. (jef),(ps) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
respm
Brief in Support
Wed 03/22 4:24 PM
Brief in Support of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Dean Guenther. (jef),(ps) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 03/22 4:23 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal, filed by Dean Guenther. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (jef) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |