Global House Buyer Limited v. James Daniel Clark et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00847 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 1:26 AM MST |
Defendant
American Impact Energy I LLC
|
|
Defendant
American Impact Energy LLC
|
|
Defendant
James Daniel Clark
an Arizona and California resident and individual 5920 Melrose Ave., 1
Los Angeles, CA 90038 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Global House Buyer Limited
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
75 | 75
order
Judgment - Default
Thu 07/20 12:31 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT - Pursuant to Rule 55(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon instruction by the Court, default judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants James Daniel Clark, American Impact Energy, LLC, and American Impact Energy I, LLC in the total amount of $313,750.00. (LAD) |
|
74 | 74
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 07/20 12:23 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default as to Defendants American Impact Energy, LLC and American Impact Energy I, LLC (Doc. 69) is granted; 2. That default is entered pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure against Defendants American Impact Energy, LLC and American Impact Energy I, LLC; 3. That Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Doc.73 ) is granted; 4. That default judgment is entered pursuant to Rule 55(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in favor of Plaintiff Global House Buyer Limited against Defendants James Daniel Clark, American Impact Energy, LLC, and American Impact Energy I, LLC in the total amount of $313,750.00; and 5. That the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action and enter judgment accordingly. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/20/17. (LAD) |