Contreras v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00857 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Feb 01, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:52 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
|
Plaintiff
Junnigh Contreras
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Mon 02/22 11:30 AM
Remark: Transferring Case to the Central District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
||
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
30+
pgs
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Fri 02/12 7:51 AM
AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
30+
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Wed 02/10 11:09 AM
SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
10
pgs
orderM
Order Reopening Case (Multiple)
Wed 02/03 2:01 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
18
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Tue 01/07 9:07 AM
ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21015 in Lead MDL 15-2641 of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/30/19. (MAP) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 03/22 2:38 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-857-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14043498 filed by Junnigh Contreras.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |