Wheeler v. United States of America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Terry J Hatter, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02161 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 08/02 4:17 PM
ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, re Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)1 . IT IS ORDERED that that the motion to vacate, set aside, or correct his sentence under 28 U.S.C. Section 2255 be, and hereby is DENIED., (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Response
Fri 07/07 8:08 AM
MR WHEELER'S PRO SE TRAVERSE TO THE GOVERNMENT'S RESPONSE TO HIS 2255 SUBSECTION A MOTION1 filed by Petitioner Welton Wheeler (shb) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 05/25 8:40 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 2255 6 served on GOVERNMENTS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT 28 U.S.C. § 2255. (Orozco, Agustin) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Wed 05/24 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 2255 filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America. (Orozco, Agustin) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 05/24 1:11 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)1(Orozco, Agustin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Mon 04/17 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Agustin Dorian Orozco on behalf of Respondent United States of America (Attorney Agustin Dorian Orozco added to party United States of America (pty:res))(Orozco, Agustin) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 04/07 8:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS -ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES RE:2255 Petition to vacate, set aside or correct sentence by a person in Federal custody1 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. The Court, having received Defendant/Petitioners Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence, Pursuant to Title 28 USC § 2255, hereby orders the government to respond to said motion no later than MAY 24, 2017. The Court further orders petitioner's reply to be filed and served not later than JULY 31, 2017. The matter will be deemed submitted, and the clerk will notify the parties when the court has reached a decision. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to US District Judge (CV-17) (2241 and 2255) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (esa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Wed 03/22 12:02 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 2:04-cr-00329 TJH, filed by petitioner Welton Wheeler. (esa) |