Shirley Lindsay v. Fahmy Mushmel et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02218 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Fahmy Mushmel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Salam Mushmel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Lindsay
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 09/12 2:51 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On August 24, 2017, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has filed a response to the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution on August 24, 2017. The Court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 08/24 4:57 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.CIV.P. 41 (a) (1) A (ii), Case be dismissed with Prejudice filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 08/24 2:27 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before September 6, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 07/18 1:40 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Effective Monday, July 31, 2017, Judge Birotte will hear all civil matters on Fridays at 10:00 a.m. Any hearing currently on calendar for Monday, July 31st or later will be heard Friday of the same week. Hearing deadlines in scheduling orders shall be read to reflect the same. Motions filed in the month of July will adhere to the current briefing schedule, with opposition and reply briefs due on Mondays. For any motion filed July 31, 2017, or later (noticed for hearing on Friday, September 1, 2017, or later) the briefing schedule shall adhere to Local Rules 7-9 and 7-10, these deadlines each falling on a Friday in accordance with the new Friday calendar dates: 21 days prior for opposition papers and 14 days prior for reply papers. All Jury Trials will still commence on Tuesdays. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 07/12 2:49 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fahmy Mushme answer now due 8/11/2017; Fahmy Mushmel(in individual) answer now due 8/11/2017; Salam Mushmel(in individual) answer now due 8/11/2017; Salam Mushme answer now due 8/11/2017, filed by Defendants Fahmy Mushme; Fahmy Mushmel(in individual); Salam Mushmel(in individual); Salam Mushme.(Attorney Dean W Hazard added to party Fahmy Mushmel(pty:dft), Attorney Dean W Hazard added to party Fahmy Mushmel(pty:dft), Attorney Dean W Hazard added to party Salam Mushmel(pty:dft), Attorney Dean W Hazard added to party Salam Mushmel(pty:dft))(Hazard, Dean) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 06/27 1:15 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, upon Defendant Salam Mushme served on 6/22/2017, answer due 7/13/2017; Salam Mushmel(in individual) served on 6/22/2017, answer due 7/13/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Salam Mushmel, in individual and representative capacity as trustee in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) |
|
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 06/27 1:03 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, upon Defendant Fahmy Mushme served on 6/22/2017, answer due 7/13/2017; Fahmy Mushmel(in individual) served on 6/22/2017, answer due 7/13/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Fahmy Mushmel, in individual and representative capacity as trustee in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 11:44 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Fahmy Mushme , Fahmy Mushmel(in individual), Salam Mushme, Salam Mushmel(in individual). (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 11:43 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/22 8:20 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Handy, Russell) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 8:19 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, (Handy, Russell) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 8:17 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Handy, Russell) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 8:16 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19553835 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Shirley Lindsay(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) |