Ayoub Mizrahi et al v. United States Department of State et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02219 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 1:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Donald A Blome
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Consulate General Jerusalem
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aaron Hellman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of State
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ayoub Mizrahi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sina Mizrahi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 06/26 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Ayoub Mizrahi. (Roston, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 06/07 10:59 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Aaron Hellman answer now due 6/26/2017; Consulate General Jerusalem answer now due 6/26/2017; United States Department of State answer now due 6/26/2017; Donald A Blome answer now due 6/26/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Aaron Hellman; Consulate General Jerusalem; United States Department of State; Donald A Blome.(Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party Donald A Blome(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party Consulate General Jerusalem(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party Aaron Hellman(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party United States Department of State(pty:dft))(Lester, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Tue 04/04 12:36 PM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 10:55 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Donald A Blome, Consulate General Jerusalem, Aaron Hellman, United States Department of State. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/22 9:29 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Ayoub Mizrahi. (Roston, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Matthew Ellsworth Roston added to party Sina Mizrahi(pty:pla))(Roston, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 9:26 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ayoub Mizrahi. (Roston, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 9:16 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19554355 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Ayoub Mizrahi. (Attorney Matthew Ellsworth Roston added to party Ayoub Mizrahi(pty:pla))(Roston, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |