Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper et al v. Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Consuelo B Marshall |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02229 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 33:1319 Clean Water Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Berkshire Hathaway Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Carlton Forge Works
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Precision Castparts Corp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ventura Coastkeeper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/28 5:03 PM
NOTICE Joint Notice of Termination of Consent Decree Pursuant to OSC Hearing of February 7, 2018 filed by Defendants Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation, Carlton Forge Works, Precision Castparts Corp. (Mills, Michael) |
|
46 | 46
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 03/28 8:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS REOPENING/CLOSING by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Case should have been closed on entry dated February 7, 2018. Other: Make JS-6. (bm) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
minutes
Show Cause Hearing - optional html form
Wed 02/07 2:35 PM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF THE [PROPOSED] CONSENT DECREE held before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The case is called and counsel state their appearance. The Court and counsel confer. Following discussion with counsel, the Court approves the parties' proposed consent decree. Upon the parties' agreement that the conditions for termination of the consent decree are met, the parties shall file a joint notice with the Court indicating the parties' agreement that the consent decree has terminated. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (shb) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
30+
pgs
order
Order
Wed 02/07 2:43 PM
CONSENT DECREE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. See order for details. (shb) |
|
Att: 1 order - consent decree part 2 | ||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 01/17 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Requesting Entry of Consent Decree re Order,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Set/Reset Hearing,41(Kracov, Gideon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Decree With Exhibits | ||
42 | 42
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/17 2:05 PM
NOTICE of No Objection filed by Interested Party USDOJ.(Mackay, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 12/04 10:31 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] CONSENT DECREE40 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. An Order to Show Cause re: Entry of the [Proposed] Consent Decree is set for February 6, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. All other deadlines in this action are vacated. (shb) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Settlement
Thu 11/30 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Ventura Coastkeeper.(Kracov, Gideon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 11/21 4:33 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1)38 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
adr
Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1)
Mon 11/20 12:10 PM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request to Appear Before Honorable Gail J. Standish for settlement proceedings. Filed by Defendants Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation, Carlton Forge Works, Precision Castparts Corp.(Morrissey, Shannon) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 11/14 4:07 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Following discussions with the parties, the Court sets the following dates:Non-Expert discovery shall be completed on or before April 15, 2018; Initial Expert Disclosures shall be completed on or before May 15, 2018; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures shall be completed on or before June 15, 2018; Expert discovery shall be completed on or before July 15, 2018; Settlement conference shall be held on or before July 30, 2018; Last day for hearings on Motions shall be set for oral argument on or before August 21, 2018 at 10:00 a.m.; Pre Trial Conference is set on October 16, 2018 at 2:30 p.m; Court Trial is set on October 30, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Est. 4-5 days); and ADR-1 Form shall be filed on or before November 20, 2017. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (smo) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 11/13 3:38 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,31 filed by Defendant Precision Castparts Corp.(Mills, Michael) |
|
35 | 35
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 11/13 3:36 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,31 filed by Defendant Carlton Forge Works.(Mills, Michael) |
|
34 | 34
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 11/13 3:18 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,31 filed by Defendant Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation.(Mills, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Status Report
Tue 11/07 11:42 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Rule 26 Report filed by Defendants Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation, Carlton Forge Works, Precision Castparts Corp. (Morrissey, Shannon) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Mon 11/06 1:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER VACATING AND DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. In light of the First Amended Complaint filed on October 27, 2017 [Doc. No. 31], the Order to Show Cause [Doc. No. 25] is hereby vacated and discharged. (smo) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 10/27 7:00 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Ventura Coastkeeper(Kracov, Gideon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/18 4:17 PM
ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, re Stipulation to File a First Amended Complaint29 . THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: Plaintiffs shall have up to and including October 27, 2017 to file the First Amended Complaint. The hearing on Precision Castparts Corp.s motion to dismiss is hereby vacated, the motion having been withdrawn by the moving party in light of the parties agreement to permit Plaintiffs to file the First Amended Complaint. (shb) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
stip
Amend/Correct
Mon 10/16 2:08 PM
STIPULATION to Amend filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper.(Kracov, Gideon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 09/29 9:57 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Other Filings - select - Miscellaneous Filings - select - Errata and link to the document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Motion Related Document
Thu 09/28 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs 26 filed by Defendant Precision Castparts Corp. (Morrissey, Shannon) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss Party
Thu 09/28 9:57 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Precision Castparts Corp. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Morrissey, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 09/19 2:03 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before October 19, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Proof(s) of service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s): Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.; An answer by the following defendant(s): Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. See order for further details. (shb) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 09/15 11:55 AM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS-ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: On the Courts own motion, this case is set for a Scheduling Conference on November 14, 2017 at 9:00 A. M. pursuant to FRCP 16(b). Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the Scheduling Conference. Counsel shall file a Rule 26(f) discovery plan within 14 days after the conference of counsel. See order for details. (shb) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 09/14 12:03 PM
ORDER granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint20 , Defendant Precision Castparts Corp answer due 9/29/2017 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 09/13 11:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation.(Morrissey, Shannon) |
|
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 09/13 11:46 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Carlton Forge Works.(Morrissey, Shannon) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 09/08 2:56 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendent Precision Castparts Corp.(Morrissey, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 08/15 11:54 AM
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES)17 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: [NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT] The Court, having considered the Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Initial Complaint (For Settlement Purposes), filed by Defendants Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation, Precision Castparts Corporation, and Carlton Forge Works, on behalf of all Parties, and good cause appearing, the deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint shall be extended from August 15, 2017, until September 14, 2017. (vv) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 08/10 4:49 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),,15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
17 | 17
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 08/10 3:23 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendants Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation, Carlton Forge Works, Precision Castparts Corp.(Mills, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint | ||
16 | 16
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 08/10 3:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation, Carlton Forge Works, Precision Castparts Corp, (Mills, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 08/10 3:06 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael N Mills counsel for Defendants Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation, Carlton Forge Works, Precision Castparts Corp. Adding Michael N. Mills as counsel of record for Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation, Precision Castparts Corporation and Carlton Forge Works for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation, Precision Castparts Corporation and Carlton Forge Works. (Attorney Michael N Mills added to party Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Michael N Mills added to party Carlton Forge Works(pty:dft), Attorney Michael N Mills added to party Precision Castparts Corp(pty:dft))(Mills, Michael) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Mon 06/19 9:35 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Waiver of Service Executed,13 , Waiver of Service Executed,11 , Waiver of Service Executed,12 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing.: The correct case number is: 17-cv-2229-CBM (GJSx). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 06/16 7:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper. upon Precision Castparts Corp waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/16/2017, answer due 8/15/2017. Waiver of Service signed by M.Campbell, lawyer for Defendant. (Kracov, Gideon) |
|
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 06/16 7:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper. upon Carlton Forge Works waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/16/2017, answer due 8/15/2017. Waiver of Service signed by M.Campbell, lawyer for Defendant. (Kracov, Gideon) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 06/16 7:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper. upon Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/16/2017, answer due 8/15/2017. Waiver of Service signed by M.Campbell, lawyer for Defendant. (Kracov, Gideon) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Text Only Notice of Judicial Move to Roybal Federal Building
Tue 06/06 4:51 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES: Effective June 1, 2017, Judge Standish is located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 640 on the 6th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 640 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 03/27 6:19 PM
STANDING ORDER. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY, IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Honorable Consuelo B Marshall. Both the Court and the attorneys bear the responsibility for the progress of litigation in this Court. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. Fed.R.Civ.P.1. NON COMPLIANCE MAY LEAD TO THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS AND INCLUDING THE STRIKING OF PLEADINGS AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION. (shb) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Thu 03/23 3:54 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-02229 CBM(GJSx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 4:50 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Arcturus Manufacturing Corporation, Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Carlton Forge Works, Precision Castparts Corp. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 4:44 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper, identifying None. (Kracov, Gideon) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 12:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper. (Kracov, Gideon) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/22 12:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper. (Kracov, Gideon) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 12:10 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19556566 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper. (Attorney Gideon Kracov added to party Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper(pty:pla))(Kracov, Gideon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |