Evaristo Cortes v. Young Shin et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02233 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Young Shin
|
|
Plaintiff
Evaristo Cortes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 08/08 3:37 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (ah) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 07/28 2:30 PM
[In Chambers] Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/7/2017. (ah) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 06/19 1:21 PM
Notice Update: Judge Stevenson will conduct all Court appearances in Courtroom 580, 5th floor located at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. Please update your records to reflect this change. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 06/05 12:09 PM
Effective June 8, 2017, Judge Stevenson will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, Suite 8100, on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 570 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/24 8:58 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. See Order for details. (sw) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 2:26 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Young Shin. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 2:11 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff EVARISTO CORTES, (Au, Roland) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 1:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff EVARISTO CORTES. (Au, Roland) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/22 1:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff EVARISTO CORTES. (Au, Roland) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 1:12 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19557221 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff EVARISTO CORTES. (Attorney Roland Au added to party EVARISTO CORTES(pty:pla))(Au, Roland) |