Rubestine Stevenson v. Synchrony Bank et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02234 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 1:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Synchrony Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Rubestine Stevenson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 04/28 11:28 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge John F. Walter: In the Notice of Settlement filed on April 27, 2017, Dkt. No.15 , the parties represent that they have settled this action. As a result, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice subject to either party reopening the action on or before 5/30/2017. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing the settlement until 5/30/2017. Thereafter, absent further order of the Court, the dismissal of this action will be with prejudice. All dates in this action, including the trial date are vacated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Settlement
Thu 04/27 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank.(Shah, Raagini) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (state court notice of settlement) | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 04/13 4:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING Stipulated Request to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Initial complaint13 by Judge John F. Walter that Defendant shall have up to and including 4/26/2017, by which to file a response to Plaintiff Complaint. (jp) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 04/12 10:00 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 04/26/2017 re Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank.(Shah, Raagini) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Declaration
Tue 03/28 10:10 AM
DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel of Defendant Synchrony Bank re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank. (Shah, Raagini) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 03/27 3:56 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by chambers of Judge John F. Walter. If not yet provided, courtesy copies of all case opening documents shall be delivered to chambers by 10:30 a.m. on March 29, 2017. Failure to comply may result in an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal and/or Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) |
|
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/27 3:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 5/15/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 4/28/2017. (jp) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 03/27 3:44 PM
STANDING ORDER. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/24 9:34 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 (CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE) served on 03/23/2017. (Shah, Raagini) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 4:07 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/23 3:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 by Mail served on 03/23/2017. (Shah, Raagini) |
|
4 | 4
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 03/23 2:24 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank.(Shah, Raagini) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank, identifying Synchrony Bank, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Synchrony Financial. (Shah, Raagini) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 1:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank. (Shah, Raagini) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 17-K-02130 Receipt No: 0973-19557435 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank. (Attorney Raagini Shah added to party Synchrony Bank(pty:dft))(Shah, Raagini) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (LASC summons and complaint) | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/23 3:16 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, Synchrony Bank. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Rubestine Stevenson. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/16/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) |