LA Gem and Jewelry Design, Inc. v. Nancy Medlin et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Ronald Sw Lew |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02239 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 1:57 AM PDT |
Defendant
Regan Suzanne Batten
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Plum Street Gifts and More, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Hot Buy King
|
|
Plaintiff
LA Gem and Jewelry Design, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Jamie Davis
Terminated: 06/20/2017
|
|
Defendant
Nancy Medlin
Terminated: 07/06/2017
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
61 | 61
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Mon 04/30 2:40 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (shb) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
60 | 60
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 04/30 2:34 PM
ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party58 . IT IS ORDERED that the above-referenced action is dismissed as to Tran, withprejudice, and that this court shall retain jurisdiction over any disputes relating to the settlement agreement reached in this matter. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys fees incurred in this Action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
59 | 59
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Fri 04/27 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff LA Gem and Jewelry Design, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Regan Suzanne Batten, Plum Street Gifts and More, LLC. (Keshishian, Milord) |
|
58 | 58
stip
Dismiss Party
Fri 04/27 4:05 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Johnny Tran filed by Plaintiff LA Gem and Jewelry Design, Inc..(Keshishian, Milord) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |