Wongab Corporation v. BCBG Max Azria Group LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02241 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 1:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
BCBG Max Azria Group LLC
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Wongab Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 06/27 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Wongab Corporation. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 06/23 3:47 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than June 30, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In the absence of showing good cause, an action shall be dismissed if the summons and complaint have not been served within 90 days after the filing of the complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). An action may be dismissed prior to such time if the Plaintiff fails diligently to prosecute the action. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of a responsive pleading to the complaint and/or proof(s) of service, which indicates proper service in full compliance with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 04/03 11:24 AM
Effective April 10, 2017, Judge McDermott will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 630 on the 6th Floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 630 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mailbox located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st Floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 03/27 2:28 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ah) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 7:28 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant BCBG Max Azria Group LLC. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 7:09 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 7:09 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Thu 03/23 2:53 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Wongab Corporation. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/22 2:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Wongab Corporation. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 2:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wongab Corporation. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wongab Corporation, (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 2:19 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19558228 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Wongab Corporation. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Wongab Corporation(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |