Victorino P. Hernandez et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02243 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 1:55 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
The Bank of New York Mellon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lerma Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victorino P. Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Dismiss Case
Tue 05/30 3:19 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS7 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED without leave to amend. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (JS-6; Case Terminated). (cr) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 05/22 12:19 PM
REPLY to Opposition in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 17 filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Gardner, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Tue 05/16 2:20 PM
Opposition Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 12 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 17 filed by Plaintiffs Lerma Hernandez, Victorino P. Hernandez. (Ensafi, Laleh) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 05/05 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Gardner, Jeffrey) |
|
16 | 16
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
Fri 05/05 10:46 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 12 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Counsel shall file and serve a new Notice of Motion with correct court location information on or before May 9, 2017. (cr) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Tue 05/02 11:50 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 12 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The wrong court location is indicated on page 6. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (cr) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 04/28 4:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon, (Gardner, Jeffrey) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 04/28 4:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, identifying BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (Gardner, Jeffrey) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 04/28 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attorney Jeffrey Burns Gardner added to party Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Burns Gardner added to party The Bank of New York Mellon(pty:dft)) (Gardner, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/31 9:43 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to defendant The Bank of New York Mellon. (mrgo) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/31 9:42 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to defendant Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/30 5:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Lerma Hernandez, Victorino P. Hernandez. (Ensafi, Laleh) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/30 5:30 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Lerma Hernandez, Victorino P. Hernandez. (Ensafi, Laleh) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/29 11:33 AM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Fri 03/24 3:19 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-02243 SVW(ASx). (rn) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 4:08 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 2:50 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF VICTORINO P FERNANDEZ, LERMA HERNANDEZ, (Ensafi, Laleh) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 2:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants VICTORINO P FERNANDEZ, LERMA HERNANDEZ. (Ensafi, Laleh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19558452 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF VICTORINO P FERNANDEZ, LERMA HERNANDEZ. (Attorney Laleh Ensafi added to party VICTORINO P FERNANDEZ(pty:bkmov), Attorney Laleh Ensafi added to party LERMA HERNANDEZ(pty:bkmov))(Ensafi, Laleh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B |