Henriette Saffron v. FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Wilner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02249 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Feb 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henriette Saffron
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Cerritos Dodge, Inc
Terminated: 03/22/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 03/14 9:17 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) re Stipulation for Order36 , (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (vm) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
3
pgs
stip
Order
Tue 03/13 12:05 PM
STIPULATION for Order Payment of Plaintiff's Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiff Henriette Saffron.(Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 03/08 2:38 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: POST-SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Courts strong preference would be to receive a single, joint submission from the parties as to each case. If the parties can limit their substantive briefing to 10 pages per side (excluding relevant exhibits), so much the better. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
transfer
Reassignment of Case (G-41)
Thu 02/15 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE filed. Pursuant to order filed on 02/12/2018. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 2:17-cv-02249 MRW. (rn) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case Reopened
Tue 02/13 2:06 PM
ORDER ONSTIPULATION TO (1) RE-OPEN THIS MATTER; (2) TRANSFER JURISDICTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILNER, AND (3) ALLOW PLAINTIFF 30-DAYS TO FILE HER MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation32 : The Court, having reviewed the Stipulation of the Parties and finding good cause based on the representations made therein, hereby makes the following order: (1) The Court's January 29, 2018 Order dismissing this matter is hereby set aside and this case is reopened for the sole purpose of allowing the filing of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses; (2) Based on the Parties stipulation and consent to the jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Wilner, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 73(b), to handle all further proceedings relating to this case, this matter is hereby transferred to Magistrate Judge Wilner for all further purposes; and (3) Plaintiff shall be allowed 30-days following the entry of this Order to file Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (bm) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
4
pgs
stip
Order
Fri 02/09 9:45 AM
STIPULATION for Order to (1) Re-open Case; (2) Transfer to Magistrate Judge; and (3) Extend time to file Motion for Attorney's Fees filed by Plaintiff Henriette Saffron.(Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 01/29 5:10 PM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: In light no appearances were made in any of the three cases referenced above, the Court dismisses all three cases for failure to prosecute. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Not Held - Settled
Wed 12/13 2:38 PM
MEDIATION REPORT filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Phyllis G Pollack: A mediation did not take place because the case settled before the session occurred.(Pollack, Phyllis) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
In Chambers Conference
Thu 11/09 9:17 AM
MINUTES [In Chambers] ORDER RE NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. By no later than November 20, 2017, counsel shall file a Notice of Mediation Date listing the date, time, and location of the mediation scheduled in this case. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (ab) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Wed 10/04 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Phyllis G Pollack has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 08/16 8:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order/Referral to ADR by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez:The Court, having considered the parties' request for a referral to the Court's Mediation Panel, hereby ORDERS the thirty (30) above referenced cases to ADR Procedure No. 2, the Mediation Panel. The ADR Program staff has assigned Panel Mediator Phyllis G. Pollack to mediate all thirty (30) cases. Ms. Pollack shall volunteer her preparation time and the first three hours of the first session. Thereafter, she may charge her market rate for that session, should it continue beyond three hours, and for the mediation sessions of the remaining cases. (bp) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 08/08 2:46 PM
MINUTES OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court ORDERS that case action CV 17-5580 PSG (MRWx) be addedto the list of cases, and that discovery be completed in all 30 cases by January 19, 2018.Further, a new Status Conference is set in all 30 cases for January 29, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (ah) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
attorney
Association of Counsel
Mon 07/24 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Sepehr Daghighian on behalf of Plaintiff Henriette Saffron. Filed by Plaintiff Henriette Saffron (Attorney Sepehr Daghighian added to party Henriette Saffron(pty:pla))(Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/04 8:12 AM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Case called. Counsel makes appearances. Court and counsel confer regarding status of the case. The Court having heard from counsel, ORDERS the following: parties to prepare a joint rule 26 report, on topics discussed in open Court, e-filed on the lead case that will apply to all cases, due by the close of business on July 31, 2017. Counsel also to meet and confer to discuss deposition process as instructed in Court. Court discusses discovery in Court. Parties to meet with Magistrate Judge Wilner to help facilitate the discovery and mediation process. The Magistrate Judge is present in Court, the parties are to meet with the Judge after Court. The parties are given 30 days to work out the details. This matter is continued to August 7, 2017 at 2:30 p.m., for a further status conference. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 06/26 7:39 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steve Borislav Mikhov counsel for Plaintiff Henriette Saffron. Adding Alastair Hamblin as counsel of record for Henriette Saffron for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Henriette Saffron. (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
22 | 22
attorney
Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
Mon 06/26 7:32 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Steve Borislav Mikhov counsel for Plaintiff Henriette Saffron. Changing firm name to Knight Law Group LLP. Changing e-mail to stevem@knightlaw.com. Filed by Plaintiff Henriette Saffron. (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 06/22 7:43 AM
TEXT ENTRY ONLY: [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. All dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Parties are ORDERED to appear for a Status Conference on July 10, 2017 at 2:30 PM.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ab) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 06/20 11:47 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Mon 06/19 4:46 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-05190 PSG(MRWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge Dolly M. Gee to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-02249 PSG(MRWx). Signed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (rn) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Thu 05/11 1:11 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/20/2017 (early mediation); 3/5/2018. Joint report re results of early mediation due by 10/27/2017; joint status report re settlement due by 3/12/2018; no appearance necessary. (gk) |
|
17 | 17
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Thu 05/11 11:44 AM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 6/12/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Amended Pleadings and Addition of Parties Cut-Off 8/4/2017. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 11/17/2017. Motions due by 2/16/2018. Settlement Conference Completion Date 3/5/2018. Motions in Limine to be filed by 4/10/2018. Joint Status Report re Settlement due by 3/12/2018. Proposed Pretrial Conference Order due by 4/24/2018. Joint Exhibit List due by 4/24/2018. Witness List due by 4/24/2018. See document for further details. (gk) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 05/04 9:23 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Scheduling Conference, currently scheduled for hearing on May 5, 2017 at 9:30 a.m., is hereby VACATED and no appearances are necessary. The Court will issue a Scheduling and Case Management Order based upon a review of the parties Joint Rule 26(f) Report. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 04/21 6:20 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiff requests10-12 days Defendant requests 3-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Henriette Saffron.. (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Transfer Pursuant to GO 16-05 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34)
Fri 04/14 3:33 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:16-cv-05190 PSG(MRWx) (rn) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Related Case(s)
Tue 04/11 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Related Case(s): 2:16-cv-05190-PSG-MRW; 2:17-cv-02128-FMO-AJW; 5:17-cv-00505 JGB-DTB; 5:17-cv-00511-JGB-SP; 2:17-cv-02267-CAS-SS; 2:17-cv-02291-R-SK; 5:17-cv-00562-AG-KS; 2:17-cv-02303-GW-JEM; 2:16-cv-05415-CAS-AS; 5:17-cv-00560-JLS-KS; 5:17-cv-00557-CAS-SS; 2:17-cv-02198-ODW-SK; 8:17-cv-00536-MWF-GJS; 2:17-cv-02316-JAK-GJS; 5:17-cv-00545 RGK(FFMx); 2:17-cv-02302-BRO-RAO; 2:17-cv-01823-PSG-JC; 5:17-cv-00549 AB (PLAx); 5:17-cv-00547-TJH-RAO; 2:17-cv-02435-AB-SS; 5:17-cv-00572-CAS-AGRx; 2:16-cv-05452-BRO-GJ; 2:17-cv-02314-MWF-GJS; 2:17-cv-02249-DMG-PLA; 5:17-cv-00568-R-MRW; 2:17-cv-02475-VAP-KS (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 04/04 8:14 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only9 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form6 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form5 served on April 3, 2017. (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/27 8:11 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)10 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Declaration,3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,4 served on March 27, 2017. (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 10:32 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/23 3:11 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (clee) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/23 3:10 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (clee) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Thu 03/23 1:55 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 1:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, identifying FCA US LLC is a Delaware Limited Liability Company and is not publicly owned. FCA North American Holdings, LLC is a Delaware Limited Liability Company that is the sole member of FCA US LLC. The sole member of FCA North America Holding LLC is Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V., which is a publically traded company incorporated under the laws of the Netherlands. (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/22 4:10 PM
DECLARATION of Kris Krueger re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 Declaration of Kris Krueger in support of Removal filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 4:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number BC 637744 Receipt No: 0973-19559848 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Attorney Scott Steven Shepardson added to party FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company(pty:dft))(Shepardson, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - FCA's Answer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Cerritos Dodge's Answer, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Notice of Entry of Dismissal | ||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/23 1:39 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/23/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #3](et) |
||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/23 1:41 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cerritos Dodge, Inc, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC., filed by Plaintiff Henriette Saffron. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/20/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #1] (et) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 03/23 1:44 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Cerritos Dodge, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/23/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #4] (Attorney Jennifer A Kuenster added to party Cerritos Dodge, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Brian added to party Cerritos Dodge, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Kristi J Livedalen added to party Cerritos Dodge, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Steven Shepardson added to party Cerritos Dodge, Inc(pty:dft))(et) |
||
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 03/23 1:46 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Henriette Saffron pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Cerritos Dodge, Inc, a California Corporation. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/22/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT # 6] (et) |