Carlos Martinez Somoza v. Rios Gutierrez
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02251 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 1:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
J. Sergio Rios Gutierrez
722 West 132nd Street
Gardena, CA 90247 |
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Martinez Somoza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Wed 07/03 10:58 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (iv) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 07/13 3:23 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza.(Eyre, Steven) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 06/14 2:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION29 CONTINUING THE PERIOD WITHIN WHICH THE PARTIES MAY APPLY TO REOPEN THIS ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The period within which the parties herein may apply to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated is continued to July 13, 2018. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Reopen Case
Wed 06/13 3:26 PM
APPLICATION to Reopen Case or in the alternative to extend the time within which to bring an application to reopen for failure to consummate settlement filed by plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza. (Eyre, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Dismissing Case
Mon 05/14 1:26 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Settlement
Mon 05/14 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza. (Eyre, Steven) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
trial
Witness List
Fri 04/27 10:59 PM
Witness List filed by plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza.. (Eyre, Steven) |
|
25 | 25
15
pgs
trial
Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
Fri 04/27 10:59 PM
MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza. (Eyre, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 04/11 11:03 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES: Effective April 17, 2018, Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 590 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 590 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil and criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services is located at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Thu 01/11 12:51 PM
STATUS REPORT RE: SETTLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza. (Eyre, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 01/10 9:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE ON FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case was called and the parties entered their appearances telephonically. The Court and the parties discussed the status of settlement discussions. The parties indicated that further discussions will not result in a settlement at this time. Court Recorder: CS-1/9/2018. (gr) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 01/04 11:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE RE: FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court hereby sets a telephonic status conference regarding further settlement discussions in this matter for Tuesday, January 9, 2017, at 10 a.m. Call-in information to be provided separately. (dml) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Tue 11/21 9:33 AM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Bryan Castorina in place of attorney J Sergio Rios Gutierrez, Pro Per filed by defendant J. Sergio Rios Gutierrez. (sbu) |
|
19 | 19
order
Substitution of Attorney -- GRANTED
Mon 11/20 2:48 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver Granting Substituting attorney Bryan T Castorina for J. Sergio Rios Gutierrez in place and stead of J. Sergio Rios Gutierrez (sbu) |
|
18 | 18
minutes
Settlement Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 11/20 1:28 PM
MINUTES OF On November 17, 2017, the parties appeared with counsel for a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver:, Set hearings A further Settlement Conference set for 12/14/2017 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Court Recorder: CS11/17/2017. (sbu) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 10/18 3:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver:, Set hearings ( Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2017 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver.) (sbu) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 05/19 9:27 AM
ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 05/19 9:25 AM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 6/5/2018 at 8:45 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 05/11 4:43 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza.. (Eyre, Steven) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 04/13 11:38 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/12 2:16 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant J. Sergio Rios Gutierrez. (lom) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/12 2:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint1 ; Request for Dismissal filed by Defendant J. Sergio Rios Gutierrez.(lom) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 03/30 2:59 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 03/29 11:39 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza, upon Defendant J. Sergio Rios Gutierrez served on 3/25/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon J. Sergio Rios Gutierrez in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Eyre, Steven) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 7:54 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant J. Sergio Rios Gutierrez. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 7:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 7:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Wed 03/22 4:29 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Carlos Martinez Somoza. (Eyre, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Issuance
Wed 03/22 4:24 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of summons filed by plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza. (Eyre, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 4:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza, (Eyre, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 4:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza. (Eyre, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 4:18 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19560120 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Carlos Martinez Somoza. (Attorney Steven J Eyre added to party Carlos Martinez Somoza(pty:pla))(Eyre, Steven) |