Celesta International Electronics Co., Ltd. v. Kross Precision Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02252 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 1:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
Leslie Dotson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kross Precision Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rob Steven Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Celesta International Electronics Co LTD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
67 | 67
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 01/03 4:08 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT REGARDING DEFENDANTS LESLIE DOTSON'S AND ROB STEVEN WILLIAMS' BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS (DKT. 66) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the Plaintiff's Status Report Regarding Defendants Leslie Dotson's and Rob Steven Williams' Bankruptcy Proceedings (the "Status Report" (Dkt. 66)). In light of the statement in the Status Report that the claims as to remaining defendants Dotson and Williams are now moot, the Court orders that this action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and to reopen the action on or before March 3, 2020, provided, however, any request by any party(ies) that the Court do so, shall make a showing of good cause as to why the action must be re-opened. This Order does not preclude the filing of a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, which does not require the approval of the Court. Such stipulation shall be filed on or before March 3, 2020, or by such later date ordered by the Court pursuant to a stipulation by the parties that conforms the requirements of a showing of good cause stated above. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc2, ) |