Aluminicaste Fundicion De Mexico S. De R.L. De C.V. v. Yu Fen Shen et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02255 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 1:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
Yu Fen Shen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Po Chi Eric Shen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aluminicaste Fundicion De Mexico S. De R.L. De C.V.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
65 | 65
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 05/29 3:59 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL64 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court, having reviewed the stipulation of plaintiff Aluminicaste Fundicin De Mxico S. De R.L. De C.V. and defendant Yu Fen Shen, the sole remaining defendant in this action, and finding that good cause exists, hereby ORDERS that this action is dismissed with prejudice.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
64 | 64
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 05/25 11:52 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Aluminicaste Fundicion De Mexico S. De R.L. De C.V..(Saunders, Daniel) |