Donzella Kensey v. The Boeing Company et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02257 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Boeing Network & Space Systems
|
|
Defendant
Boeing, Defense, Space & Security
|
|
Defendant
The Boeing Company
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Donzella Kensey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 04/05 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Donzella Kensey. Dismissal is without. (Young, Gregory) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Mon 04/03 2:40 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-02257 MWF(Ex). (rn) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/31 8:39 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendants Boeing Network and Space Systems, Boeing, Defense, Space and Security, The Boeing Company. (jp) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/27 6:01 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,8 filed by Plaintiff Donzella Kensey. (Haney, Steven) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Thu 03/23 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 4:08 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 03/22 7:02 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Donzella Kensey. Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-01679-DSF (MRWx) (Haney, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 6:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Donzella Kensey, (Haney, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/22 6:49 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Donzella Kensey. (Haney, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 6:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Donzella Kensey. (Haney, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 6:44 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19561266 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Donzella Kensey. (Attorney Steven H Haney added to party Donzella Kensey(pty:pla))(Haney, Steven) |