Michael Robles v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02258 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 25, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
Exxon Mobil Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Robles
6237 Lanto Street
Bell Gardens, CA 90201 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
67 | 67
minutes
Motion Hearing Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 02/27 9:38 AM
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW56 ; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND COOPERATE WITH HIS COUNSEL Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. On January 24, 2019, the Court issued an order to show cause for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute and to cooperate with his counsel. No response or objection by Plaintiff has been filed. Plaintiff is hereby notified that Plaintiff's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. Furthermore, this action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Attorney Kiernan A McAlpine; Robert C Moest; John A Daspit and Charles Clinton Hunter terminated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
66 | 66
misc
Status Report
Fri 02/22 2:25 PM
STATUS REPORT re Notice to Client of Court Order of January 24, 2019 filed by Plaintiff Michael Robles. (Hunter, Charles) |