Horacio Camberos v. Tani G. Cantil-Sakauye et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00514 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Forma Pauperis Denial |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe Brako
|
|
Defendant
Karen Brako
|
|
Defendant
Tani G. Cantil-Sakauye
|
|
Defendant
Jane Doe Kim
|
|
Defendant
Mark C. Kim
|
|
Defendant
Jackie Lacey
|
|
Defendant
John Does Lacey
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Sakauye
|
|
Plaintiff
Horacio Camberos
AU6572 Ironwood State Prison PO Box 2199
Blythe, CA 92226 |
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)
Thu 10/26 1:55 PM
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, ORDERING Application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit submitted by Plaintiff Horacio Camberos received on 4/7/17 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Case closed 5/16/17. The document is NOT to be filed, but instead REJECTED, and is ORDERED returned to counsel. Counsel shall immediately notify, in writing, all parties previously served with the attached documents that said documents have not been filed with the Court.. (ab) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P)
Thu 05/18 10:10 AM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILINGS FEES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez4 . REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee is denied. Case is hereby dismissed immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (pso) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Miscellaneous)
Mon 05/01 11:15 AM
RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. Re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support4 . (vm) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Wed 04/26 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)
Wed 04/26 4:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF FUNDS IN PRISONER'S ACCOUNT filed by plaintiff Horacio Camberos. (ghap) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Wed 04/26 4:19 PM
DECLARATION in Support of (VERIFIED COMPLAINT BILL IN EQUITY) of Horacio Camberos re Complaint - ,2 filed by Plaintiff Horacio Camberos. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint - (Referred)
Wed 04/26 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT (VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed against defendants John Doe Brako, Karen Brako, Tani G. Cantil-Sakauye, Jane Doe Kim, Mark C. Kim, Jackie Lacey, John Does Lacey, John Doe Sakauye Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner., filed by plaintiff Horacio Camberos. (ghap) Modified on 4/26/2017 (ghap) |
|
Att: 1 Part 1 Complaint | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Discrepancies with Lodging of Complaint (CV-47)
Wed 03/22 2:11 PM
NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Plaintiff Horacio Camberos. Upon submission of your complaint it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the CV60 form attached. If you do not respond within 30 days of the date of this letter your action will be dismissed. Re Lodged Complaint (ghap) (ghap). (ghap) |
|
Att: 1 (3/22/2017) Lodged Complaint and Civil Cover Sheets, | ||
Att: 2 (3/22/2017) Lodged Declaration in Support of Amended Complaint Bill in Equity, | ||
Att: 3 (3/22/2017) Lodged Proposed Order | ||
Att: 4 (3/22/2017) CV-60 |