Prompt Staffing, Inc. et al v. United States of America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00542 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 28:7402 Refund of Taxes |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 26, 2018 12:10 PM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
24 HR Personnel, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Prompt Staffing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edith Uribe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago |
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
91 | 91
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Mon 10/02 8:53 AM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/24/18 re Transcript90 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) |
|
90 | 90
transcript
-Transcript
Mon 10/02 8:51 AM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/24/18. Court Reporter: DEBORAH K. GACKLE, CSR, RPR, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/23/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2024. (ha) |