Sokhon Khourn Nelms v. Jeff Sessions et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00517 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 08:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Detainee |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:27 AM PDT |
Petitioner
Sokhon Khourn Nelms
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Thomas Horman
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
John F. Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Jeff Sessions
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 06/05 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Sokhon Khourn Nelms. (Karimlou, Makeda) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 04/04 2:05 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Ira Lester counsel for Respondents Thomas Horman, John F. Kelly, Jeff Sessions. Adding Robert I, Lester as counsel of record for Respondents for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondents Robert I. Lester. (Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party Thomas Horman(pty:res), Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party John F. Kelly(pty:res), Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party Jeff Sessions(pty:res))(Lester, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Fri 03/31 1:40 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Sokhon Khourn Nelms. (Karimlou, Makeda) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Requiring Return/Answer to Petition
Fri 03/31 9:22 AM
ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION (FEDERAL CUSTODY) by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. IT IS ORDERED that: Within 14 days, Respondent shall file and serve a Notice of Appearance. (See document for further details).Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (mr) |
|
Att: 1 Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Petition - Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Petition - Part 2, | ||
Att: 4 Petition - Part 3, | ||
Att: 5 Petition - Part 4, | ||
Att: 6 Petition - Part 5, | ||
Att: 7 Petition - Part 6, | ||
Att: 8 Consent Form | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/24 2:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Miscellaneous Document4 filed by Petitioner Sokhon Khourn Nelms. (Karimlou, Makeda) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Wed 03/22 2:27 PM
AO 242 filed by Petitioner Sokhon Khourn Nelms (Karimlou, Makeda) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Sokhon Khourn Nelms, (Karimlou, Makeda) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 2:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Sokhon Khourn Nelms. (Karimlou, Makeda) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 1:58 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Receipt No. 0973-19557560 for $5 filing fee, filed by Petitioner Sokhon Khourn Nelms. (Attorney Makeda Karimlou added to party Sokhon Khourn Nelms(pty:pet))(Karimlou, Makeda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit |