Jason Franklin v. Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00522 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Winn Law Group, A Professional Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Jason Franklin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 06/29 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Jason Franklin. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause
Thu 06/29 9:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney:, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's counsel, to show cause in writing no later than July 3, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: See document for details. (dv) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 7:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Winn Law Group. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 7:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 7:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 8:42 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jason Franklin, (Friedman, Todd) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 8:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jason Franklin. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/22 8:42 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Jason Franklin. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 8:41 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19561377 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Jason Franklin. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Jason Franklin(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd) |