(PC) Rodriguez v. County of Sacramento et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sheila K Oberto |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00412 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Defendant
County of Sacramento
|
|
Defendant
Erik Maness
|
|
Defendant
Scott Jones
|
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Rodriguez
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Case Transferred Out - Divisional
Thu 03/23 9:15 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/23/2017. New Case Number 2:17-cv-00611-CMK (PC). Old Case Number 1:17-cv-00412-SKO (PC). (Jessen, A) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/22 10:22 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Raymond Rodriguez. (Jessen, A) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint
Wed 03/22 10:19 AM
(1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against County of Sacramento, Scott Jones, Erik Maness by Raymond Rodriguez.. (Jessen, A) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |