Renfro et al v. J.G. Boswell Co. Inc. et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J O'Neill |
Referred: | Erica P Grosjean |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00418 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
J.G. Boswell Tomato Co. Kern
|
|
Defendant
Young's Commerical Transfer, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stockwell Wolverton
|
|
Defendant
Larry Sailors
|
|
Defendant
Jesse Nunez
|
|
Defendant
Tim Niswander
|
|
Defendant
National Inter-State Insurance Co.
|
|
Defendant
Mes Solutions
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Thomas Leonard
|
|
Defendant
Rusty Lantsberger
|
|
Defendant
Lakeland Aviation
|
|
Defendant
Kings County Ag Commissioners Office
|
|
Defendant
Zach Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Gary Johnson
|
|
Defendant
J.G. Boswell Tomato Co Kings
|
|
Defendant
J.G. Boswell Co. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Erick J. Hansen
|
|
Defendant
H & G Farms
|
|
Defendant
Juan Doe
|
|
Defendant
Gabby Doe
|
|
Defendant
Cruz Doe
|
|
Defendant
Randy Daniels
|
|
Defendant
Tony Cisneros
|
|
Defendant
Ben Bozak
|
|
Defendant
Danial Agulaliar
|
|
Plaintiff
Sima Edsell
280 E. Putnam Ave.
Porterville, CA 93257 |
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Renfro
PO Box 495
Tipton, CA 93272 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Fri 07/07 10:18 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Re Defendant's Motion to Remand to State Court5 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/6/17: CASE REMANDED to Superior Court for the County of Kings. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Copy ( certified )of remand order sent to other court . (CASE CLOSED) (Hellings, J) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 07/07 10:19 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:12 Order on Motion to Remand, served on Sima Edsell, Christopher Renfro. (Hellings, J) |
||
service
Service by Mail
Fri 07/07 10:35 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:12 Order on Motion to Remand (certified copy), served on Clerk of the Court for the Kings County Superior Court at 1640 Kings County Dr., Hanford, CA 93230. (Hellings, J) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minute Order ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement
Fri 06/30 2:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Having reviewed preliminarily the papers filed in connection with the pending motion to remand5 , the Court concludes that oral argument is unnecessary. Therefore, the hearing on the motion is VACATED, and the matter is submitted for decision on the papers pursuant to Local Rule. 230(g). A written decision will issue signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 30, 2017. (Munoz, I) |
|
10 | 10
respm
Exhibit
Fri 06/30 12:39 PM
EXHIBIT A TO REPLY DECL. OF WILLIAM A. BRUCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND re5 MOTION to REMAND filed by Young's Commerical Transfer, Inc.. (Bruce, William) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 06/30 2:58 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Minute Order served on Sima Edsell, Christopher Renfro. (Munoz, I) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Reply
Thu 06/29 4:46 PM
REPLY by Young's Commerical Transfer, Inc. re5 MOTION to REMAND .(Bruce, William) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration William A. Bruce | ||
8 | 8
misc
Reply
Thu 06/29 4:28 PM
REPLY by Young's Commerical Transfer, Inc. re5 MOTION to REMAND .(Bruce, William) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration William A. Bruce | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Declaration
Tue 06/20 9:55 AM
DECLARATION of Christopher Renfro in Opposition to5 Motion to Remand. (Jessen, A) |
|
6 | 6
respm
Opposition to Motion
Tue 06/20 9:54 AM
MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in OPPOSITION to5 Request to Remand of This Request for Federal Complaint, by Christopher Renfro. (Jessen, A) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Remand
Fri 06/02 1:44 PM
MOTION to REMAND by Young's Commerical Transfer, Inc.. Attorney Bruce, William Aubrey added. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(Bruce, William) |
|
Att: 1 Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Notice Request for Judicial Notice | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 05/01 4:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING 2 3 In Forma Pauperis Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/1/2017. (Rosales, O) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 05/01 4:19 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Sima Edsell, Christopher Renfro. (Rosales, O) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
misc
IFP Application
Thu 04/13 3:20 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Lundstrom, T) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
misc
IFP Application
Thu 03/23 8:00 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Hellings, J) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/22 3:56 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sima Edsell. (Hellings, J) |
|
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/22 3:56 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Christopher Renfro. (Hellings, J) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sima Edsell, Christopher Renfro.(Hellings, J) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |