(SS) Sanders v. Commissioner of Social Security
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kendall J Newman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00605 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2018 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
|
|
Plaintiff
Darrell Curtis Sanders
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 08/31 11:24 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER FOR THE AWARD AND PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/30/18. The court makes no finding with respect to footnote 1 in the stipulation.(Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 08/30 11:11 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Attorney Fees and Expenses Under The Equal Access To Justice Act by Darrell Curtis Sanders.(Haley, Denise) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment
Thu 07/05 1:10 PM
JUDGMENT dated *7/5/2018* pursuant to order signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/5/2018. (Fabillaran, J) |
|
23 | 23
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 07/05 1:09 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/5/2018 GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's15 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING the Commissioner's20 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; The final decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and the action is REMANDED for further administrative proceedings consistent with this order pursuant to sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). CASE CLOSED. (Fabillaran, J) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Designation of Counsel
Tue 01/23 10:20 AM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Edward Alan Olsen, ss for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Bobbie J. Montoya, ss terminated (Olsen, Edward) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Reply
Mon 01/08 5:00 PM
REPLY by Darrell Curtis Sanders re1 Social Security Complaint,. (Haley, Denise) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 12/13 3:07 PM
CROSS-MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT and OPPOSITION to15 Motion for Summary Judgment by Commissioner of Social Security (Illarmo, Marcelo) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 11/01 2:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/1/2017 : The parties' stipulation (ECF No.18 ) is APPROVED. The Commissioner shall file its response to plaintiff's motion no later than 12/13/17, and plaintiff's reply brief is due no later than 01/02/2018. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 10/31 3:03 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time re15 Motion for Summary Judgment by Commissioner of Social Security. (Illarmo, Marcelo) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minute Order
Fri 10/13 10:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/13/2017 : Good cause having been shown, plaintiff's application (ECF No.16 ) is GRANTED, and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (ECF No.15 ) is DEEMED TIMELY FILED. All other case deadlines are adjusted accordingly. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Application
Thu 10/12 5:56 PM
APPLICATION for late filing by Darrell Curtis Sanders re15 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Darrell Curtis Sanders. (Haley, Denise) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 10/12 5:54 PM
MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Darrell Curtis Sanders. (Haley, Denise) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 09/19 1:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/19/2017 : The parties' stipulation (ECF No.13 ) is APPROVED. Plaintiff shall have until 10/11/2017 to file a motion for summary judgment. All other case deadlines are adjusted accordingly. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 09/18 4:23 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time by Darrell Curtis Sanders. (Haley, Denise) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Acknowledgement of Receipt
Wed 07/26 3:02 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of11 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT by Commissioner of Social Security. (Routed to the file room) (Kastilahn, A) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Lodging Social Security Administrative Transcript
Wed 07/26 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT by Commissioner of Social Security. In Paper Format and E-Filing Electronic Administrative Transcript(Montoya, Bobbie) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/26 7:48 AM
ANSWER by Commissioner of Social Security.(Illarmo, Marcelo) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/19 3:18 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bobbie J. Montoya, ss on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Montoya, Bobbie J. added. (Montoya, Bobbie) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Tue 05/02 4:10 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Illarmo, Marcelo N. added. (Illarmo, Marcelo) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/27 10:06 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Darrell Curtis Sanders. (Haley, Denise) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 04/27 10:05 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Darrell Curtis Sanders. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/24/2017, answer due 6/23/2017.(Haley, Denise) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider
Mon 04/10 1:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 7/13/2017. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons
Mon 04/10 1:14 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Denise Bourgeois Haley* *Law Offices of Lawrence D. Rohlfing* *12631 East Imperial Highway, Suite C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Zignago, K.) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/10 1:13 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/10/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff's2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Service of process is appropriate for the Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the United States Marshal and shall file a statement with the court that such documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/22 11:48 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Darrell Curtis Sanders.(Haley, Denise) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Social Security Appeal)
Wed 03/22 11:44 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT For Review of The Final Decision Of The Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security by Darrell Curtis Sanders.(Haley, Denise) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Of Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
IFP Application
Wed 03/22 12:30 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Kaminski, H) |