Victoria Nelson, et al v. Bert Hansen
Original Case: 2:11-cv-00492
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-15506 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 29, 2018 1:29 AM PDT |
Defendant - Appellee
BERT HANSEN, DBA High Scaler Cafe, DBA Hoover Dam Snacketeria
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
VICTORIA NELSON, Chapter 7 Trustee in Bankruptcy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRUNO LIGUORI TURQUOISE TRADING, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/29/2018 1:25 AM PDT |
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/28/2017. First cross appeal brief due 06/22/2017 for Bert Hansen. Second brief on cross appeal due 07/24/2017 for Bruno Liguori Turquoise Trading, Inc. and Victoria Nelson. Third brief on cross appeal due 08/24/2017 for Bert Hansen. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Bruno Liguori Turquoise Trading, Inc. and Victoria Nelson is due within 14 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [10365037] 17-15506 17-15455 (RT) [Entered: 03/21/2017 10:41 AM] |