Alfredo Miranda v. County of Lake, et al
Original Case: 1:12-cv-04439
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01603 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 13, 2018 3:27 AM CDT |
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ACLU OF ILLINOIS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
RODERICK & SOLANGE MACARTHUR JUSTICE CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LAKE COUNTY, ILLINOIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
WAYNE HUNTER, Corrections Chief
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT FITCH, Health Services Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROZEL ELAZEGUI, Doctor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HARGURMUKH SINGH, Doctor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALFREDO MIRANDA, Administrator of estate of Estate of Lyvita Gomes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/13/2018 3:27 AM CDT |
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 04/05/2017. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/01/2017 for Alfredo Miranda. [1] [6827844] 17-1603 (CR) | |
2 | 2 ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW [6827931] [2] [6827931] 17-1603 (AP) | |
3 | 3 Added Attorney(s) Janis M. Susler for party(s) Appellant Alfredo Miranda, in case 17-1603 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jan Susler for Appellant Alfredo Miranda. [3] [6828005] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) 17-1603 --[Edited 03/22/2017 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Susler, Janis) | |
4 | 4 Added Attorney(s) Shubra Ohri for party(s) Appellant Alfredo Miranda, in case 17-1603 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Shubra Ohri for Appellant Alfredo Miranda. [4] [6828012] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) 17-1603 --[Edited 03/22/2017 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Ohri, Shubra) | |
5 | 5 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Alfredo Miranda. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [6828045] 17-1603 (Hoft, Janine) |