Chimeka Randle v. Texarkana AR Housing Authority, et al
Original Case: 4:16-cv-04025
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01612 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 3:29 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RichSmith Development LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Chimeka Randle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/21/2017 3:29 AM CDT |
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4514933] 17-1612 (CMH) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 2/6/2017, and Order dated 3/8/2017.[4514954] 17-1612 (CMH) | ||
CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/19/2017, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4514957] 17-1612 (CMH) | ||
CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4514960] 17-1612 (CMH) |