BLOCKUM v. EDWARDS
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Clay D Land |
Referred: | Charles H Weigle |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00055 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 03, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint
Thu 08/31 12:31 PM
ORDER denying as moot22 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 8/30/2017. (ggs) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 07/10 2:07 PM
MANDATE of USCA dismissing appeal pursuant to voluntary dismissal filed by appellant as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss Complaint
Mon 07/10 1:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Petition re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Filed by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Letter to USCA requesting dismissal of appeal, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Fri 06/30 9:41 AM
Letter from VICTOR BLOCKUM regarding requesting copy of docket sheet (mailed) (ggs) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Affidavit
Fri 06/02 1:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF JASON MOON as to VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL(cma) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 05/24 9:54 AM
ORDER denying12 Motion for Involuntary Bankruptcy. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 5/24/2017. (ggs) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/23 1:55 PM
STATEMENT FROM JASON MOON as to Victor Leon Blockum.(cma) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/22 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Filing with USCA: Miscellaneous filings regarding witness statements and new statement from C. Chafin, as to Appellant Victor Leon Blockum El. by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL (ggs) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/19 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF FILING: Various Exhibits in Support by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL(cma) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits-Various Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/19 9:06 AM
USCA NOTICE of filing: as to Appellant Victor Leon Blockum El. (cma) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/19 8:59 AM
USCA NOTICE of filing: Mailing from Appellant with summary letter and pages/notes from GBI investigation as to Appellant Victor Leon Blockum El by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL (cma) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Thu 05/18 1:14 PM
Letter from Christopher Lee Chafin regarding Sworn Statement on behalf of Victor Blockum.(cma) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/21 1:41 PM
MOTION Involuntary Bankrupty on Oglethorpe Superior Court Fines etc. Filed by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 04/18 12:13 PM
USCA Case Number 17-11630 J re9 Notice of Appeal filed by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL. (ggs) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 04/10 12:01 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:6 Judgment,5 Order,9 Notice of Appeal Judge Appealed: Clay D. Land. Court Reporter: N/A. Fee Paid: NOT PAID. (ggs) |
|
9 | 9
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 04/10 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to6 Judgment,5 Order by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL.(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/10 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Bad Faith and Have Blocked His Oath so It would not be Evidence by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
appeal
Electronic Availability of ROA
Mon 04/10 12:02 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:9 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (ggs) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Exhibit
Tue 04/04 10:19 AM
EXHIBIT(S) by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus.(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Mon 04/03 4:09 PM
JUDGMENT (ggs) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Mon 04/03 3:53 PM
ORDER dismissing as frivolous re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM EL. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 4/3/2017. (ggs) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Thu 03/30 3:37 PM
Letter from VICTOR BLOCKUM EL regarding enclosing amended civil cover sheet and requesting name correction on docket re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus.(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Mon 03/27 2:37 PM
Letter from VICTOR BLOCKUM regarding New Republic of the United States(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/23 1:05 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles H. Weigle issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 03/23 1:04 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against IRA EDWARDS filed by VICTOR LEON BLOCKUM(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Acceptance and related documents, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Constitutional Question, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - UCC Financing Statement and related documents, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Truth Affidavit and related documents, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - 28:1441, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Resolution adopted by the General Ssembly on 12/16/2005, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - H. Res. 194, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - S. Con. Res 26, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - H. J. Res. 3, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - United nations Declaration on the Rights of Indigenous Peoples, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Treaty with Morocco 1836, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - 27 CFT 72.11 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Paid
Mon 03/27 12:33 PM
Filing fee Paid: Habeas $5.00, Receipt No: 41509. (cma) |