THOMAS v. BERRYHILL et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | C Ashley Royal |
Referred: | Charles H Weigle |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00107 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:206 Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Thu 03/15 12:43 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of NANCY A BERRYHILL against ERICA THOMAS (ans) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 03/14 9:45 AM
ORDER adopting16 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 3/14/2018 (lap) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Report and Recommendation
Thu 01/25 11:39 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that theCommissioners decision be AFFIRMED re1 Complaint (IFP) filed by ERICA THOMAS Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 01/25/18. (ans) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 12/19 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BARBARA G PARKER on behalf of NANCY A BERRYHILL Attorney BARBARA G PARKER added to party NANCY A BERRYHILL(pty:dft) (PARKER, BARBARA) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Brief (Social Security Cases Only)
Tue 07/25 2:48 PM
BRIEF Memorandum in Support of the Commissioner's Decision by NANCY A BERRYHILL (HALL, AIMEE) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension
Thu 07/13 9:02 AM
Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension re:13 Letter regarding Extension to File Defendant's Brief (ans) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Wed 07/12 4:24 PM
Letter regarding Extension to File Defendant's Brief (HALL, AIMEE) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Brief (Social Security Cases Only)
Wed 06/21 3:39 PM
BRIEF in Support of Complaint by ERICA THOMAS (GOODMAN, EMMETT) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Social Security Transcript
Tue 05/23 9:52 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Hearing filed re1 Complaint (IFP) Volume Number: 1 of 1.(HALL, AIMEE) |
|
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 2 Documents Related to Administrative Process, | ||
Att: 3 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 5 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 6 Disability Related Development Part 1, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development Part 2, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/23 9:47 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by NANCY A BERRYHILL.(HALL, AIMEE)Attorney AIMEE J HALL added to party NANCY A BERRYHILL(pty:dft) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return
Mon 04/03 2:43 PM
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for NANCY A BERRYHILL (cma) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return
Mon 03/27 1:41 PM
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for NANCY A BERRYHILL (ans) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 03/27 8:23 AM
Summons Issued as to NANCY A BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ans) |
|
6 | 6
service
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return
Mon 03/27 8:23 AM
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for NANCY A BERRYHILL (ans) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 12:11 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 3/24/2017. (jfb) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Thu 03/23 10:13 AM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ERICA THOMAS (ans) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/23 10:13 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ans) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/23 10:03 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ERICA THOMAS filed by EMMETT L GOODMAN, JR.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(GOODMAN, EMMETT) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 USM 285, | ||
Att: 6 USM 285, | ||
Att: 7 USM 285 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Complaint (IFP)
Thu 03/23 9:54 AM
COMPLAINT (IFP) against NANCY A BERRYHILL filed by ERICA THOMAS(GOODMAN, EMMETT) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |