Kaehr v. Commissioner of Social Security
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William C Lee |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00114 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 05/29 10:41 AM
MANDATE of USCA (certified) as to22 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Wayne Kaehr. IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, pursuant to the JOINT MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CASE, filed on May 24, 2018, by counsel for the appellant and appellee and Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (lhc) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 03/12 3:22 PM
USCA Case Number 18-1544 for22 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Wayne Kaehr. (lhc) |
|
25 | 25
appeal
Short Record Sent to USCA
Mon 03/12 10:16 AM
Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re22 Notice of Appeal. No appeal fees paid. (lhc) |
|
Saturday, March 10, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Transcript Request
Sat 03/10 3:36 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST No Transcript Requested, No Hearing Held by Daniel Wayne Kaehr. (Forbes, Randal) |
|
23 | 23
appeal
Docketing Statement
Sat 03/10 3:33 PM
Docketing Statement re:22 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Wayne Kaehr. (Forbes, Randal) |
|
22 | 22
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Sat 03/10 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to21 Clerks Judgment,20 Opinion and Order, Terminate Civil Case, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Wayne Kaehr. (Forbes, Randal) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Clerks Judgment
Thu 01/11 9:40 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (mlc) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
10
pgs
order
Opinion and Order Terminate Civil Case
Thu 01/11 8:16 AM
OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 1/10/18. (mlc) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
ss
Social Security Response Brief of Government
Tue 10/24 1:32 PM
RESPONSE BRIEF re18 Social Security Opening Brief of Plantiff by Commissioner of Social Security. (Montenegro, Leo) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
ss
Social Security Opening Brief of Plaintiff
Tue 09/12 11:30 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY OPENING BRIEF of Plaintiff by Daniel Wayne Kaehr. (Forbes, Randal) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 08/21 12:01 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Pla's16 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief is granted. The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 9/12/2017. No further extension will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 10/24/2017. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 11/7/2017. Text entry order. (mr) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 08/15 11:56 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Brief by Plaintiff Daniel Wayne Kaehr. (Forbes, Randal) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 07/24 11:53 AM
ENTRY for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Pla's14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief is granted. The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 8/15/2017. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 9/26/2017. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 10/10/2017. So Ordered. (mr) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 07/18 12:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff"s Opening Brief by Plaintiff Daniel Wayne Kaehr. (Forbes, Randal) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated
Mon 06/05 2:26 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. Magistrate Consent forms due by 6/26/2017. (mr) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order Setting Social Security Deadlines
Mon 06/05 2:26 PM
ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 7-3, the claimant/plaintiff is directed to file his/her opening brief by the deadline set out below. Failure to do so could result in dismissal of this case pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Briefs under this rule are subject to the page limitations in Local Rule 7-1(e). The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 7/18/2017. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 8/29/2017. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 9/12/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/5/2017. (mr) |
|
11 | 11
ss
Social Security Administrative Record
Mon 06/05 11:29 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF DANIEL KAEHR by Commissioner of Social Security. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/26 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leo R Montenegro on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Montenegro, Leo) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 04/10 2:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Daniel Wayne Kaehr. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/5/2017 (lhc) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 04/10 2:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Daniel Wayne Kaehr. Commissioner of Social Security (US Attorney General) served on 4/5/2017. (lhc) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 04/10 2:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Daniel Wayne Kaehr. Commissioner of Social Security (AUSA) served on 4/6/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (lhc) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 03/28 10:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS) (lns) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/28 10:09 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pla Daniel Wayne Kaehr; WAIVING the filing fee; and DIRECTING the USMS to effect service of process on Dft. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 3/28/2017. (cc: USMS) (lns) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/24 8:46 AM
Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE; IFP PENDING) (ksp) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/23 8:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Rodman on behalf of Daniel Wayne Kaehr (Rodman, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/23 8:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Randal S Forbes on behalf of Daniel Wayne Kaehr (Forbes, Randal) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/23 8:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Daniel Wayne Kaehr. (Forbes, Randal) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/23 8:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Daniel Wayne Kaehr.(Forbes, Randal) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |