Fuentes-Barnett v. Sessions et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Referred: | John Z Boyle |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00858 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:25 AM MST |
Petitioner
Obed Fuentes-Barnett
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
John F Kelly
|
|
Respondent
Enrique Lucero
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Jeff B Sessions
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Respondent
Juan P Osuna
Terminated: 03/31/2017
|
|
Respondent
Richard Phelps
Terminated: 03/31/2017
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 10/30 11:25 AM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline for filing motion for attorneys' fees. Petitioner's motion for attorneys' fees (if any) shall be filed no later than 12/13/2017. The Court will not grant further extension to this deadline absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/30/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 10/27 4:02 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Deadline for Motion for Attorney's Fees by Obed Fuentes-Barnett.(Green, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Clerks Judgment
Mon 07/31 7:33 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT it is ordered and adjudged that pursuant to the Court's Order filed July 31, 2017, judgment of dismissal is entered. This action is hereby dismissed as moot. (LSP) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order
Mon 07/31 7:31 AM
ORDER that this action is dismissed as moot. The Clerk must close this action. Petitioner may file an appropriate motion for attorneys' fees under the EAJA in compliance with the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court will retain jurisdiction of this matter for 180 days in the event that Petitioner's bond is redetermined resulting from the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/28/17. (LSP) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Report - Status
Wed 07/12 12:59 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by John F Kelly, Enrique Lucero, Juan P Osuna, Richard Phelps, Jeff B Sessions. (Nickerson, Theo) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Expedite
Fri 06/16 9:34 AM
ORDER granting23 Petitioner's motion to expedite and granting5 Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order. Within 20 days, Respondents must provide Petitioner with a hearing before an Immigration Judge with the power to grant him release on bond if the Immigration Judge determines that he qualifies for release under applicable law. Within 5 days of Petitioner's forthcoming bond hearing, the parties must provide a joint status report to the Court indicating what remaining proceedings are necessary. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/16/17.(LSP) |
|
Sunday, June 04, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Expedite
Sun 06/04 9:13 PM
First MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order by Obed Fuentes-Barnett.(Green, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Second Amended Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, May 13, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respoth
Reply to Response to Habeas Petition (Fed/2241)
Sat 05/13 8:24 AM
REPLY TO RESPONSE to15 Habeas Petition (Fed/2241) filed by Obed Fuentes-Barnett.(Green, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 05/12 5:55 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Obed Fuentes-Barnett.(Green, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 05/02 10:35 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jeff B Sessions. (LSP) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 05/02 10:32 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Leave to File Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Out of Time. The Clerk shall file Respondents' Response in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction lodged at (Doc.18 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 5/2/17.(LSP) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respoth
Lodged Proposed Document
Fri 04/28 7:41 PM
LODGED Proposed Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re:17 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Jeff B Sessions. (Nickerson, Theo) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 04/28 7:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Jeff B Sessions.(Nickerson, Theo) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Filing - Proposed Pretrial Order
Tue 04/25 6:04 PM
NOTICE of Filing - Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Obed Fuentes-Barnett as to Motion for Preliminary Injunction .(Green, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Response to Habeas Petition (Fed/2241)
Fri 04/21 1:25 PM
Government's RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) by Enrique Lucero, Jeff B Sessions.(Nickerson, Theo) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit immigration documents | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Fri 04/21 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Theo Nickerson on behalf of Enrique Lucero, Jeff B Sessions. (Nickerson, Theo) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service Executed
Tue 04/11 8:43 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Petition, Motion and Order upon Secretary for the Department of Homeland Security on Date Not Provided. (KAS) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service Executed
Thu 04/06 3:41 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Petition, Motion and Order upon US Attorney General on 04/04/2017. (KAS) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service Executed
Thu 04/06 8:50 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Petition, Motion and Order upon Field Office Director, Enforcement and Removal Operations on date not provided. (KAS) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service Executed
Thu 04/06 8:47 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Petition, Motion and Order upon US Attorney, District of Arizona on 04/03/2017. (KAS) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/31 2:09 PM
Summons Issued as to John F Kelly, Enrique Lucero, Jeff B Sessions, US Attorney for the District of Arizona. (LAD) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 03/31 1:20 PM
ORDER - Respondents Osuna and Phelps are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Summons, the Petition (Doc.1 ), Motion (Doc.5 ), and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court must also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, and this Order to the United States Attorney General pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(B) and to Respondents pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/31/17. (LAD) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order of Recusal ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/24 1:56 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. I hereby recuse myself from any further action in the above-captioned matter and order this case to be reassigned, by lot, to another judge in the District of Arizona. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED this matter is reassigned by random lot to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 17-00858 PHX-DGC. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/24/2017. (KAL) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 03/23 12:53 PM
First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Obed Fuentes-Barnett.(Green, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 10:36 AM
Summons Issued as to John F Kelly, Enrique Lucero, Juan P Osuna, Richard Phelps and Jeff B Sessions. NOTE: Caption edited to reflect "Jeff B Sessions et al," in the place of "Loretta Lynch et al." (ATD) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/23 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. (ATD) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 03/23 10:20 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Obed Fuentes-Barnett. (submitted by Matthew Harrison Green) (ATD) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241)
Thu 03/23 10:17 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-14045864 filed by Obed Fuentes-Barnett. (submitted by Matthew Harrison Green) (ATD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet |