Lough v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00859 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:49 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Lough
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
9
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Wed 12/18 1:07 PM
ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21014 in Lead MDL 15-2641 of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/17/19. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/23 9:08 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV 17-0859 PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/23 9:06 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14045970 filed by Randy Lough.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |