Nichols v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00861 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:11 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Ann Nichols
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 09/18 10:06 AM
ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 12453, in Lead MDL 15-2641 of Dismissal Without Prejudice. ORDERED that all claims of Plaintiff Betty Ann Nichols against Defendants C.R. Bard, Inc., and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. in Civil Action No.: MDL 15-02641 PHX-DGC (Member Case CV 17-0861 PHX DGC) are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice as to the refiling of same, and each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/17/18. (MAP) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Thu 08/30 11:45 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:3 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Betty Ann Nichols. Document entered in wrong case. All documents must be filed in lead case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/29 6:23 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Betty Ann Nichols. (Murphy, Peyton) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/23 9:29 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV 17-0861 PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/23 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14046399 filed by Betty Ann Nichols.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |