Pablos et al v. Bayer Corporation et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00863 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:36 AM MST |
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer Essure Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Pablos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacy Pablos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Thu 07/20 7:57 AM
ORDER granting19 Stipulation and dismissing this action in its entirety, without prejudice and directing the Clerk to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/19/17. (LSP) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/17 12:11 PM
STIPULATION Tolling Agreement.signed by Danny Pablos, Stacy Pablos. (Kauffman, Randal) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/17 11:10 AM
STIPULATION re:18 Stipulation Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Danny Pablos, Stacy Pablos.(Kauffman, Randal) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/17 10:43 AM
STIPULATION Tolling Agreement by Danny Pablos, Stacy Pablos. (Kauffman, Randal) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/03 1:05 PM
MOTION judicial notice , Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Essure Incorporated, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Pharmaceuticals Incorporated.(Sutton, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 07/03 12:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Essure Incorporated, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Sutton, Jared) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Service Executed
Tue 06/27 3:42 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Danny Pablos, Stacy Pablos: Affidavit of Process re: Summons, Complaint, 04-11-17 Order, 06-09-17 Order upon Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 06-20-17. (Palumbo, Scott) |
|
14 | 14
service
Service Executed
Tue 06/27 3:41 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Danny Pablos, Stacy Pablos: Affidavit of Process re: Summons, Complaint, 04-11-17 Order, 06-09-17 Order upon Bayer Heathcare on 06-21-17. (Palumbo, Scott) |
|
13 | 13
service
Service Executed
Tue 06/27 3:39 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Danny Pablos, Stacy Pablos: Affidavit of Process re: Summons, Complaint, 04-11-17 Order, 06-09-17 Order upon Bayer Essure, Inc. on 06-20-17. (Palumbo, Scott) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service Executed
Mon 06/26 10:01 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Danny Pablos, Stacy Pablos: Affidavit of Process re: Summons, Complaint, 04-11-17 Order, 06-09-17 Order upon Bayer Corporation on 06/20/17. (Palumbo, Scott) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 06/09 5:46 PM
ORDER granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint10 . Defendants are allowed up to and including 7/3/2017 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/9/2017. (LMR) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Fri 06/09 1:33 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT First Request by Danny Pablos, Stacy Pablos.(Kauffman, Randal) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Tue 04/11 6:08 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/11/2017. (LMR) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 04/10 8:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J. Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-17-863-PHX-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Mon 04/10 8:30 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/07 3:51 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Fri 04/07 3:51 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX184090 as to Charles R Houssiere, III. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/23 12:53 PM
Motion for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Charles R Houssiere on behalf of Plaintiffs Danny Pablos and Stacy Pablos. (Palumbo, Scott) Modified on 3/23/2017 (BAS) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 12:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Corporation, Bayer Essure Incorporated, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Pharmaceuticals Incorporated.(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/23 12:05 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14046672. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00863 PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached.(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 MAG 25 Instructions | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 03/23 12:03 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Danny Pablos, Stacy Pablos.(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/23 12:02 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14046672 filed by Stacy Pablos, Danny Pablos (submitted by Scott Palumbo).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |