Nichols v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00868 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:23 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia Nichols
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Thu 01/09 11:06 AM
ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21030 in Lead MDL 15-2641 of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/20. (MAP) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Tue 09/03 8:49 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:3 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Julia Nichols. Document entered in wrong case. All pleadings should be filed in the lead MDL 15-2641 case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Substitute Attorney
Tue 09/03 8:02 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Julia Nichols.(McCarley, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/23 12:43 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-868-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/23 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14047559 filed by Julia Nichols.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |