Shirley Lindsay v. Bong S. Chang
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | S James Otero |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02260 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bong S. Chang
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Gail Killefer
US District Court 1027 312 N Spring Street
Los Angeles, CA 90012 |
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Lindsay
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 09/20 3:52 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.CIV.P. 41 (a) (1) A (ii), Case be dismissed with Prejudice filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/15 10:48 AM
ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that the parties will file a Joint Stipulation for Dismissal within 60 days. The Court sets a Status Conference/OSC for Monday, November 20, 2017 8:30 am at which the parties, by and through their attorneys of record shall show cause why this case is not dismissed. The parties shall file a joint status report by November 6, 2017. If this case is dismissed prior to this hearing, the hearing will be automatically vacated and no appearance shall be required. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Settlement
Wed 09/13 8:12 PM
NOTICE of Settlement jointly filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
Fri 09/08 5:15 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Gail Killefer: Mediation held on September 8, 2017, and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judges deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case.(Killefer, Gail) |
|
Saturday, August 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/29 4:47 PM
ORDER by Judge S. James Otero, re Stipulation for Order22 . Having read the forgoing joint stipulation, it is hereby ordered that the mediation completion date be continued from August 23, 2017 to September 8, 2017. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Order
Wed 08/23 4:17 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order to Extend Mediation Completion Date filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Statement
Tue 08/15 2:13 PM
STATEMENT Defendant Bong S. Chang's Evidence of Correction of Alleged ADA Violations re: Order on Application to Stay Case17 . (Singh, Navdeep) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Tue 08/08 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for August 25, 2017, at 10:00 a.m.(Killefer, Gail) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Mon 08/07 11:12 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for August 15, 2017, at 11:00 a.m.(Killefer, Gail) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Statement
Thu 07/06 9:10 AM
STATEMENT Plaintiffs Case Statement filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay re: Order on Application to Stay Case17 . (Price, Dennis) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22)
Wed 06/28 2:14 PM
ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting14 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Bong S Chang. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 8/23/2017. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 06/21 4:13 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defedant Bong S. Chan , Bong S. Chang(in individual ), re APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation,14 served on 6/21/2017.(Singh, Navdeep) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 06/21 2:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: The Court is in receipt of Defendant Bong S. Chang's Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation, filed June 9, 2017. Defendant is ORDERED to file a Proof of Service for the Application by Thursday, June 22. 2017. (lc) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21)
Fri 06/09 2:46 PM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by defendant Bong S. Chan . (Singh, Navdeep) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment and Proposed Order to Application for Stay and Early Mediation ADR-21 | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
Thu 06/08 4:55 PM
ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation,11 , for the following reasons: FAILURE to comply with L.R. 5-4.4 Submission of Proposed Orders, Judgments, or Other Proposed Documents That Require a Judges Signature. (lc) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 05/25 3:50 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Bong S. Chan , Bong S. Chang(in individual ), re APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation,11 served on 5-25-17.(Singh, Navdeep) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment to Proof of Service | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21)
Thu 05/25 2:32 PM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by defendant Bong S. Chan , Bong S. Chang(in individual ). (Singh, Navdeep) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order to Application for Stay | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 05/01 3:40 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bong S. Chan answer now due 5/31/2017; Bong S. Chang(in individual ) answer now due 5/31/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Bong S. Chan; Bong S. Chang(in individual ).(Attorney Navdeep Kumar Singh added to party Bong S. Chang(pty:dft), Attorney Navdeep Kumar Singh added to party Bong S. Chang(pty:dft))(Singh, Navdeep) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/17 1:59 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, upon Defendant Bong S. Chan served on 4/10/2017, answer due 5/1/2017; Bong S. Chang(in individual ) served on 4/10/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bong S. Chang, in individual and representative capacity as trustee of the Bong S. Chang Lifetime Trust in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/24 2:53 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (jy) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 3:46 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Bong S. Chan , Bong S. Chang(in individual ). (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 3:34 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/23 6:19 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Handy, Russell) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 6:12 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, (Handy, Russell) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 6:10 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Handy, Russell) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 6:06 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19561535 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Shirley Lindsay(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) |