Monique Gutierrez et al v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02268 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
Exxon Mobil Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monique Gutierrez
individually and a/n/f of J.P., J.P., M.P., K.P., and R.B. 3423 West 190th Street, Apt. C
Torrance, CA 90504 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Latosha Padilla
individually and a/n/f of J.P., J.P., M.P., K.P., and R.B. 3423 West 190th Street, Apt. C
Torrance, CA 90504 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 05/26/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
56 | 56
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 07/26 4:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE55 by Judge John F. Walter. Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation and confidential settlement agreement, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action, including all claims asserted by Plaintiffs against Defendant, be and hereby is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
55 | 55
3
pgs
stip
Order
Wed 07/25 6:26 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order re Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation.(Sestito, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |