Anthony Warren v. Mastec, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02271 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Mastec Network Solutions
|
|
Defendant
Mastec Network Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mastec, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matt Bistline
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Warren
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Wed 03/29 1:30 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Remand Case to State Court
Wed 03/29 1:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: remanding case to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case number BC639516, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) |
|
10 | 10
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 03/28 11:30 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Mastec Network Solutions, Inc., Mastec, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Notice of Related Case(s)4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on March 24, 2017. (Groode, Steven) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 03/27 12:18 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Percy Anderson. Percy. Scheduling Conference set for May 8, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. See document for details. (lom) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Mon 03/27 12:01 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 3:03 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 2:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Mastec Network Solutions, Inc., Mastec, Inc.. (Groode, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Thu 03/23 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Mastec Network Solutions, Inc., Mastec, Inc.. (Groode, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/23 2:07 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Mastec Network Solutions, Inc., Mastec, Inc. identifying MasTec, Inc. is the parent company of Defendant MasTec Network Solutions, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Groode, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Mastec Network Solutions, Inc., Mastec, Inc., identifying MasTec, Inc., MasTec Network Solutions, Inc. and Matt Bistline (improperly named as Matt Bisline). (Groode, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC639516 Receipt No: 0973-19564862 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Mastec Network Solutions, Inc., Mastec, Inc.. (Attorney Steven Andrew Groode added to party Mastec Network Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Andrew Groode added to party Mastec, Inc.(pty:dft))(Groode, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/24 2:53 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Matt Bistline, Does 1 to 100, inclusive, Mastec Network Solutions, Mastec Network Solutions, Inc., Mastec, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Anthony Warren. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/3/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #1] (et) |
||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/24 2:58 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT COMPLAINT (Fictitious/Incorrect name) Incorrect Name, the Plaintiff having designated a defendant in the complaint by the incorrect name of MATT BISLINE and having discovered the true name of defendant to be MATT BISTLINE amends the complaint by subsituting the true name for the incorrect name whereever if appears in the complaint., filed by Plaintiff Anthony Warren [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT # 3](et) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 03/24 3:01 PM
CONFORMED FILED CANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Mastec Network Solutions, Inc., Mastec, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/13/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT # 2](et) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/24 3:36 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Warren, upon Defendant Mastec Network Solutions served by certified mail on 11/18/2016, answer due 12/9/2016. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/19/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT D TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #4] (et) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/24 3:38 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Warren, upon Defendant Mastec, Inc. served by certified mail on 11/18/2016, answer due 12/9/2016. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/19/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT D TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #4] (et) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/24 3:51 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Warren, upon Defendant Matt Bistline served on 2/9/2017, answer due 3/2/2017. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/10/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT D TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT # 4] (et) |