Klauber Brothers Inc v. Urban Outfitters Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02273 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Urban Outfitters Inc
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Benjamin S. Seigel
|
|
Plaintiff
Klauber Brothers Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Not Held - Settled
Mon 05/21 2:42 PM
MEDIATION REPORT filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Benjamin S. Seigel: A mediation did not take place because the case settled before the session occurred.(Seigel, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 05/18 9:52 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc.(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/06 5:04 PM
ORDER on Stipulation to Dismiss Action Without Prejudice39 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) This action is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); (2) This dismissal is subject to and predicated upon the settlement agreement that gave rise to this dismissal; (3) The parties will each bear their respective costs and attorneys fees as incurred against one another in connection with this action; and (4) The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement entered into in this matter. (jp) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 03/05 4:42 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc.(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Wed 02/21 8:57 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) Mailed copies to the Register of Copyrights. (gk) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Minutes of 2/1/2018 | ||
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 02/02 9:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dolly M. Gee:, (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) In light of Plaintiffs notice of settlement, filed February 1, 2018, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By March 5, 2018 the parties shall file either (1) a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment or (2) motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of March 6, 2018. (yl) |
|
36 | 36
notice
Settlement
Thu 02/01 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Settlement of Action filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc. (Burroughs, Scott) |
|
35 | 35
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
Thu 02/01 11:20 AM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Benjamin S. Seigel: Mediation held on 01/31/18 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Seigel, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
Wed 01/31 4:11 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Benjamin S. Seigel: Mediation held on 01/31/18 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Seigel, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 11/20 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Third Party Defendant CHARMING GARMENT SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation dba ACE TRIMS, identifying Charming Garment Supply, Inc. dba Ace Trims, Klauber Brothers, Inc. and Heyri J, Inc. dba Everleigh. (Myung, Soohyun) |
|
32 | 32
answer
Answer to Third Party Complaint
Mon 11/20 9:32 AM
ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Third Party Complaint,23 filed by Third Party Defendant CHARMING GARMENT SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation dba ACE TRIMS.(Attorney Soohyun Calvin Myung added to party CHARMING GARMENT SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation dba ACE TRIMS(pty:3pd))(Myung, Soohyun) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 11/15 12:15 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Heyri J, Inc., upon Third Party Defendant CHARMING GARMENT SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation dba ACE TRIMS served on 11/2/2017, answer due 11/24/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeannie K. (Doe), Person Apparently in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lim, S) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/30 5:02 PM
ORDER RE CONTINUING EARLY MEDIATION COMPLETION DEADLINE AND AMENDING SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation28 , this Court grants the parties' request and amends the deadline to complete mediation as set forth in the 6/22/2017 Scheduling and Case Management Order re: Jury Trial to 2/1/2018 and further amends the deadline to file the Joint Report re: Results of Early Mediation to 2/8/2018. (gk) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/26 1:24 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint,23 as to Third party Defendant CHARMING GARMENT SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation dba ACE TRIMS. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Continue
Wed 10/25 3:43 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Mediation Completion Deadline from December 1, 2017 to February 1, 2018 filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiff Heyri J, Inc., Urban Outfitters Inc.(Lim, S) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 10/25 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiff Heyri J, Inc., Urban Outfitters Inc, (Lim, S) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Summons Request
Tue 10/24 10:50 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Third Party Complaint,23 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Heyri J, Inc.. (Lim, S) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Mon 10/23 1:47 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request24 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The third-parties must be named exactly as how it is the third-party complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Summons Request
Mon 10/23 11:31 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Third Party Complaint,23 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Heyri J, Inc.. (Lim, S) |
|
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Third Party Complaint
Mon 10/23 11:24 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition19 , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against CHARMING GARMENT SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation dba ACE TRIMS filed by Defendant Heyri J, Inc..(Attorney S Young Lim added to party Heyri J, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lim, S) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 09/25 12:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc. upon Heyri J, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/14/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Shelley A. Sagara, Esq., Attorney for Defendant. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued
Mon 09/25 9:10 AM
21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint19 as to Defendants Urban Outfitters Inc., Heyri J, Inc. individually and d/b/a "Everleigh," and Does 1 through 10. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Summons Request
Tue 09/19 10:12 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition19 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
19 | 19
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Tue 09/19 10:03 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 09/18 6:08 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation17 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be e-filed within three days of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any Defendant that has previously filed an Answer in this action may file a renewed responsive pleading within 21 days of the filing of the First Amended Complaint. Should any Defendant that has previously filed an Answer not file a renewed responsive pleading, its Answer to the previous Complaint will be deemed responsive to the First Amended Complaint. Any Defendant that has not previously filed a responsive pleading shall file a responsive pleading within 21 days of their respective service of the First Amended Complaint. (gk) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Leave
Fri 09/15 3:04 PM
STIPULATION for Leave to to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Thu 08/17 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Benjamin S. Seigel has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Thu 06/22 1:10 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 12/1/2017 (early mediation); 5/17/2018. Joint report re results of early mediation due by 12/8/2017; joint status report re settlement due by 5/24/2018; no appearance necessary. (gk) |
|
14 | 14
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Thu 06/22 12:49 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 7/24/2017 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Amended Pleadings and Addition of Parties Cut-Off 9/22/2017. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 3/8/2018. Motions due by 3/16/2018. Settlement Conference Completion Date 5/17/2018. Motions in Limine to be filed by 5/24/2018. Joint Status Report re Settlement due by 5/24/2018. Proposed Pretrial Conference Order due by 6/5/2018. Joint Exhibit List due by 6/5/2018. Witness List due by 6/5/2018. See document for further details. (gk) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates | ||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 06/02 12:24 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc..(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 05/11 5:08 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (clee) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/08 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Urban Outfitters Inc, identifying Urban Outfitters, Inc., a Pennsylvania Corporation. (Lim, S) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/08 11:29 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Urban Outfitters Inc.(Attorney S Young Lim added to party Urban Outfitters Inc(pty:dft))(Lim, S) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/28 10:15 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (clee) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 6:09 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Urban Outfitters Inc. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 5:54 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 5:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/23 2:06 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Thu 03/23 2:06 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Klauber Brothers Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 2:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 2:04 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19564500 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Klauber Brothers Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |