Hugo Esqueda v. Fasil Assefa et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02274 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
Fasil Assefa
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Hugo Esqueda
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 07/31 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Hugo Esqueda. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Kim, Sung) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 07/28 4:05 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hugo Esqueda, upon Defendant Fasil Assefa served on 6/22/2017, answer due 7/13/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Fasil Assefa, Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kim, Sung) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Dismiss Case
Thu 07/20 3:36 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS10 . Plaintiffs failure to oppose the Motion to Dismiss itself operates as consent to granting that Motion. Moreover, the Motion should be granted on the merits. Plaintiff is further ORDERED to show cause, in writing, (1) why he should be granted leave to amend; (2) why he should not be sanctioned for failure to participate in preparing the Rule 26(f) status report, see Local Rule 37-4; and (3) why the action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Rule 41(b). Plaintiffs response shall be filed on or before Monday, July 31, 2017. Failure to respond to the Courts Order will result in dismissal of the action with prejudice. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 07/18 10:36 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss10 is appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for 7/24/2017, is VACATED and taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 06/21 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Fasil Assefa. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attorney Michael S Orr added to party Fasil Assefa(pty:dft)) (Orr, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 04/03 11:25 AM
Effective April 10, 2017, Judge McDermott will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 630 on the 6th Floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 630 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mailbox located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st Floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Fri 03/24 10:37 AM
NOTICE to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. PLAINTIFF is directed to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed with the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (cw) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 6:14 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Fasil Assefa. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 5:56 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 5:55 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 1:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hugo Esqueda, (Kim, Sung) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 1:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hugo Esqueda. (Kim, Sung) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/23 1:27 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Hugo Esqueda. (Kim, Sung) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19564580 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Hugo Esqueda. (Attorney Sung T Kim added to party Hugo Esqueda(pty:pla))(Kim, Sung) |