Adam Trotter v. ExxonMobil Corp. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02279 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
City of Torrance, California
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ExxonMobil Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ExxonMobil Oil Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ExxonMobil Refining and Supply Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PBF Energy Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PBF Energy Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PBF Energy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PBF Energy Western Region LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PBF Holding Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
South Coast Air Quality Management District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Torrance Refining Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Trotter
P O Box 4171
Redondo Beach, CA 90277 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
State of California, South Coast Air Quality Management District
Terminated: 05/04/2017
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
155 | 155
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Thu 06/06 12:14 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,152 filed by Adam Trotter. CCA No. 19-55358 Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal is granted. This appeal is dismissed with prejudice. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (bm) |