Lilia Nuno v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02281 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
NDEX West LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Lilia Nuno
an individual 2129 W 21st Street
Los Angeles, CA 90018 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Thu 05/11 4:42 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Central District. (jp) |
|
23 | 23
order
Remand Case to State Court
Thu 05/11 4:41 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Remanding Action by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: IT IS ORDERED THAT (1) Plaintiff Motion to Remand (Document No. 16) is granted. (2) The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, California 90012, pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c). (3) The Clerk shall send a certified copy of this Order to the state court. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 05/01 9:35 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss9 and Scheduling Conference are taken off the 5/4/2017 calendar. The motion is placed under submission. No appearances are required on 5/4/2017. An order with the court's ruling and regarding further proceedings will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Wed 04/26 12:52 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court16 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Report
Thu 04/20 4:16 PM
DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. AND NDEX WEST LLC'S JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. |
|
19 | 19
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 04/20 10:19 AM
REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 04/18 9:50 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by plaintiff Lilia Nuno, re Opposition to Motion to Dismiss17 served on 4/14/2017. (jp) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Fri 04/14 3:57 PM
OPPOSITION TO MOTION to Dismiss Case9 filed by Plaintiff Lilia Nuno. (lom) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Fri 04/14 3:55 PM
MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Lilia Nuno. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (lom) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/10 10:18 AM
NOTICE THAT STATE COURT RECEIVED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 04/07 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant NDEX West LLC, identifying BDF Holdings LP. (Lee, James) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Joinder (Motion Related)
Fri 04/07 3:20 PM
JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by Defendant NDEX West LLC.(Lee, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting NDEX WEST, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/30 3:18 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) |
|
11 | 11
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 03/30 3:17 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
10 | 10
misc
For Judicial Notice
Thu 03/30 11:13 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 IN SUPPORT OF WELLS FARGO'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 03/30 11:11 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/30 11:09 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Joinder (non-motion)4 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form5 OF REMOVAL-RELATED DOCUMENTS served on March 24, 2017. |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Wed 03/29 10:50 AM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-02281 FMO(ASx). (rn) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 4:21 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Joinder
Thu 03/23 2:45 PM
JOINDER filed by Defendant NDEX West LLC joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 2:40 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Wells Farsgo & Company; Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.. |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 2:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Supeerior Court, case number BC648349 Receipt No: 0973-19565391 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Scott Thomas Reigle added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft)) |
|
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/24 4:16 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants NDEX West LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Does 1 to 100, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Lilia Nuno. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/30/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (et) |