Maria Rangel v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02289 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 12/29 11:26 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion and Order Affirming Decision of Commissioner filed concurrently herewith, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (im) |
|
21 | 21
5
pgs
order
Order
Fri 12/29 11:25 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING DECISION OF COMMISSIONER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. It is ordered that Judgment be entered affirming the decision of the Commissioner and dismissing this action with prejudice. SEE ORDER. (im) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 11/01 4:09 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Answer filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Yang, Annabelle) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Wed 09/27 4:47 PM
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Plaintiff Maria Rangel. (Perales, Monica) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respoth
Administrative Record
Wed 08/23 9:43 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Yang, Annabelle) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 5 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 08/23 9:33 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Yang, Annabelle) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/12 9:47 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Yang, Annabelle) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 05/17 3:26 PM
Effective May 24, 2017, Judge MacKinnon will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 840 on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 840 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Thu 05/04 10:37 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV17-2289 AFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 05/03 10:10 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Annabelle J Yang added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Yang, Annabelle) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Tue 04/18 2:26 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Perales, Monica) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Tue 04/18 2:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maria Rangel, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/13/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to O. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Perales, Monica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 04/03 2:15 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (See document for details). (ib) |
|
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 04/03 2:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. (See document for details). (ib) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/30 1:53 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (ib) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/30 1:46 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting3 Plaintiff's REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (CV-60). (ib) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maria Rangel, (Perales, Monica) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 5:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maria Rangel. (Perales, Monica) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/23 5:36 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Maria Rangel. (Perales, Monica) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/23 5:36 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Maria Rangel. (Perales, Monica) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 5:35 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Maria Rangel. (Attorney Monica Perales added to party Maria Rangel(pty:pla))(Perales, Monica) |