Rafael Cardenas v. FCA US LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Wilner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02291 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Rafael Cardenas
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Premier Automotive of West Covina LLC
Terminated: 03/23/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
58 | 58
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 02/26 10:48 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The stipulation is approved. The entire action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. re Stipulation to Dismiss Case57 . (vm) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
57 | 57
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 02/25 9:36 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Rafael Cardenas.(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |