J.G. et al v. Long Beach Unified School District
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia A Phillips |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02292 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Long Beach Unified School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J.G.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy G
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
50 | 50
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/14 9:28 AM
ORDER RE STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF ACTION49 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case49 : The Parties' Stipulation Regarding Dismissal with prejudice of this Action is hereby granted. (bm) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
49 | 49
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 06/07 4:13 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Court's Approval of Minor's Compromise and Exchange of Settlement Draft filed by Defendant Long Beach Unified School District.(Wadlington, Marlon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |